EP0020461 - AIR DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.1986 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.03.1986 [1986/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITCO CORPORATION 440 Somerville Avenue Somerville, MA 02143 / US | [1981/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GORCHEV, Dimiter 8 Whittier Place Boston, MA 02114 / US | 02 /
INGARD, Karl Uno Kittery Point ME 03905 / US | 03 /
WILLKE, Herbert L., Jr. 55 Magazine Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [1981/01] | Representative(s) | Holdcroft, James Gerald, et al Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/01] | Holdcroft, James Gerald, Dr., et al Graham Watt & Co., Riverhead Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 2BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 79901272.9 | 20.09.1979 | [1981/01] | WO1979US00745 | Priority number, date | US19780944134 | 20.09.1978 Original published format: US 944134 | [1981/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8000743 | Date: | 17.04.1980 | [1980/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0020461 | Date: | 07.01.1981 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.1980 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1981/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0020461 | Date: | 27.03.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.1981 | Classification | IPC: | F24F13/04, F24F7/06 | [1981/01] | CPC: |
F24F13/24 (EP,US);
F24F3/044 (EP,US);
F24F7/08 (EP,US);
Y10S454/906 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR [1981/01] | Title | German: | LUFTVERTEILSYSTEM | [1981/01] | English: | AIR DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM | [1981/01] | French: | SYSTEME DE DISTRIBUTION D'AIR | [1981/01] | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.1980 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.1980 | Search fee paid | 11.06.1980 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.1980 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.1980 | Examination requested [1981/01] | 15.03.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 07.02.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.03.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.09.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.09.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1683572 [ ] (SCHOETTLER BENNO); | GB1423986 [ ] (COLCHESTER WOODS); | FR2176654 [ ] (INST PENTRU CREATIE STINTIFIC [RO]); | FR2266780 [ ] (ETERNIT FINANCIERE [FR]); | US3049067 [ ] (LYSIANE CLAUDE JANINE); | US3965933 [ ] (BEAUDIN PATRICK L) | International search | [X]US3748997 (DEAN F, et al); | [X]US2295251 (BAKER THOMAS A); | [X]GB444206 (RALPH POOLE, et al); | [X]GB1198549 (PAR ACOUSTICS LTD); | [A]CA715865 (GRUENZWEIG & HARTMANN); | [X]DE708098 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE); | [X]US2267425 (WILLIAM ROWE, et al) |