EP0020530 - CENTRIFUGE APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING HOLLOW MICROSPHERES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.01.1981 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.1981 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.04.1981 [1981/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOROBIN, Leonard B. 13433 N.E. 45th Street Bellevue, WA 98004 / US | [1981/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1981/01] | Application number, filing date | 79901405.5 | 21.09.1979 | [1981/01] | WO1979US00760 | Priority number, date | US19780944643 | 21.09.1978 Original published format: US 944643 | US19790059296 | 20.07.1979 Original published format: US 59296 | US19790059297 | 20.07.1979 Original published format: US 59297 | US19790069295 | 24.08.1979 Original published format: US 69295 | [1981/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8000695 | Date: | 17.04.1980 | [1980/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0020530 | Date: | 07.01.1981 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.1980 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1981/01] | Classification | IPC: | C03B19/10, C03C25/02 | [1981/01] | CPC: |
C03B37/045 (EP,US);
B01J13/22 (EP);
B01J20/28 (EP);
B01J35/51 (EP);
B29C49/0042 (EP,US);
B29C49/46 (EP);
B29C70/58 (EP);
C03B19/1075 (EP);
C03B37/022 (EP);
C03B37/0756 (EP);
C04B14/24 (EP);
C04B20/1055 (EP);
F16L59/065 (EP);
F16L59/08 (EP);
F24S80/525 (EP,US);
B22F2009/088 (EP);
B29C2049/4605 (EP);
B29C2049/4647 (EP);
B29C2049/465 (EP);
B29C2049/4655 (EP);
B29C2049/4664 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | FR [1981/01] | Title | German: | ZENTRIFUGE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG HOHLER MIKROSPHÄREN | [1981/01] | English: | CENTRIFUGE APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING HOLLOW MICROSPHERES | [1981/01] | French: | APPAREIL CENTRIFUGE ET METHODE DE PRODUCTION DE MICROSPHERES CREUSES | [1981/01] | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 21.10.1980 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1981/13] | 22.12.1980 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1981/13] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US948541 (COLEMAN CLYDE J [US]); | [A]US3186812 (PFAENDER LAWRENCE V); | [X]US3257183 (NEWARK THE PARK NATIONAL BANK, et al); | [X]US3282066 (SEARIGHT WILLIAM H); | [A]US3421873 (BURGMAN JEROME A, et al); | [A]US3765853 (RIEBLING E); | [X]US3877918 (CERBO THOMAS A); | [X]US4026499 (CROSBY DAVID ROGERS); | [AE]US4116656 (MUKAI KUNIHIKO, et al) |