EP0014348 - Method of transmitting a stereophonic signal via two separate sound carriers contained in a television signal, as also a decoder for deriving right and left information from a stereophonic signal thus transmitted [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1980/17] | Method of transmitting, and apparatus for receiving stereophonic signals via two equivalent channels, in particular a two-carrier television sound method | ||
[1986/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.1987 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.04.1987 [1987/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte GmbH Schutzrechtsverwertung & Co. KG. Bahnstrasse 62 40210 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/19] | For all designated states Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte GmbH Schutzrechtsverwertung & Co. KG. Bahnstrasse 62 D-40210 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1981/06] | For all designated states IGR Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte GmbH Bahnstrasse 62 D-4000 Düsseldorf 1 / DE | ||
Former [1980/17] | For all designated states Aigner, Max, Dipl.-Ing. Spitzwegstrasse 63 D-8012 Ottobrun / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aigner, Max, Dipl.-Ing. Spitzwegstrasse 63 D-8012 Ottobrunn / DE | [1986/17] |
Former [1981/06] | 01 /
Aigner, Max, Dipl.-Ing. Spitzwegstrasse 63 | ||
Former [1980/17] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Konle, Tilmar Benderstrasse 23 a 81247 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/42] | Konle, Tilmar, Dipl.-Ing. Benderstrasse 23 a D-81247 München / DE | ||
Former [1981/19] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1980/17] | Konle, Tilmar, Dipl.-Ing. Institut für Rundfunktechnik GmbH Floriansmühlstrasse 60 D-8000 München 45 / DE | Application number, filing date | 80100219.7 | 17.01.1980 | [1980/17] | Priority number, date | DE19792902933 | 26.01.1979 Original published format: DE 2902933 | [1980/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0014348 | Date: | 20.08.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0014348 | Date: | 23.04.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.1980 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/00, H04N7/06 | [1980/17] | CPC: |
H04H20/88 (EP);
H04N7/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, GB, IT, NL, SE [1980/17] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Übertragen und Vorrichtung zum Empfangen stereophoner Signale auf zwei gleichwertigen Einzelkanälen, insbesondere Zwei-Trägerverfahren beim Fernsehton | [1980/17] | English: | Method of transmitting a stereophonic signal via two separate sound carriers contained in a television signal, as also a decoder for deriving right and left information from a stereophonic signal thus transmitted | [1986/17] | French: | Procédé pour la transmission d'un signal stéréophonique par deux porteuses de son distinctes contenues dans un signal de télévision ainsi que décodeur pour la restitution des informations de droite et de gauche provenant d'un signal stéréophonique ainsi transmis | [1986/17] |
Former [1980/17] | Method of transmitting, and apparatus for receiving stereophonic signals via two equivalent channels, in particular a two-carrier television sound method | ||
Former [1980/17] | Procédé pour la transmission et dispositif pour la réception de signaux stéréophoniques par deux canaux équivalents, notamment procédé à deux porteuses de son de télévision | Examination procedure | 24.06.1980 | Examination requested [1980/19] | 23.04.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.1982 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 08.03.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.06.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 03.02.1982 | Appeal received No. T0096/82 | 26.05.1982 | Statement of grounds filed | 27.02.1984 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1984/09] | 21.03.1984 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1984/12] | Opposition(s) | 24.01.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.04.1980 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 15.04.1980 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 15.04.1980 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 15.04.1980 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 15.04.1980 | IT   M02   Not yet paid | 15.04.1980 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 15.04.1980 | SE   M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.02.1982 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   03.05.1982 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4048654 [ ] (WEGNER CARL R); | DE2827159 [ ] (INST RUNDFUNKTECHNIK GMBH) | [ ] - JOURNAL OF THE AUDIO ENGINEERING SOCIETY, Band 23, Nr. 10, Dezember 1975, Seiten 802-805 New York, U.S.A. E.L. TORICK: "AM Stereophonic Broadcasting - An Historical Review" * Seite 803, linke Spalte, Absatz 2 * | [ ] - JOURNAL OF THE ASIA ELECTRONICS UNION, Band 3, Nr. 2, 1970, Seiten 12-21 Tokyo, JP. Y. NUMAGUCHI: "Television Sound Multiplexing System" * Seite 13, Absatz 3; Seite 18, rechte Spalte, Absatz 1 * | [ ] - RUNDFUNKTECHNISCHE MITTEILUNGEN, Band 23, Nr. 1, Februar 1979, Seiten 10-13 Hamburg, DE. M. AIGNER et al.: "Eine neue Stereomatrizierung fur den Fernsehton" * Seite 11, linke Spalte, Absatz 2 - Seite 12, linke Spalte, Absatz 5 * |