EP0013947 - Internal combustion engine with rotary pistons of the internal axis type [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.1981 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SABET, Huschang Maybachstrasse 16 D-70469 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/16] | For all designated states SABET, Huschang Maybachstrasse 16 D-70469 Stuttgart1 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sabet, Huschang, Dipl.-Ing. Eduard-Pfeiffer Strasse 67 D-7000 Stuttgart 1 / DE | 02 /
Eckhardt, Dietrich, Dr. Steinäcker 60 D-7307 Aichwald-Lobenrot / DE | [1980/16] | Representative(s) | Maier, Eugen, et al Patentanwälte Dr.-Ing. Eugen Maier Dr.-Ing. Eckhard Wolf Pischekstrasse 19 D-7000 Stuttgart 1 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/16] | Maier, Eugen, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dr.-Ing. Eugen Maier Dr.-Ing. Eckhard Wolf Pischekstrasse 19 D-7000 Stuttgart 1 / DE | Application number, filing date | 80100233.8 | 18.01.1980 | [1980/16] | Priority number, date | DE19792902915 | 26.01.1979 Original published format: DE 2902915 | [1980/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0013947 | Date: | 06.08.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.1980 | Classification | IPC: | F01C1/077, F02B55/08 | [1980/16] | CPC: |
F01C1/07 (EP);
F02B75/021 (EP);
F02B2075/025 (EP);
F02B53/00 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT, SE [1980/16] | Title | German: | Mittelachsige Umlaufkolben-Brennkraftmaschine | [1980/16] | English: | Internal combustion engine with rotary pistons of the internal axis type | [1980/16] | French: | Moteur à combustion interne à pistons rotatifs du type à axe interne | [1980/16] | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 09.03.1981 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1981/34] | 20.05.1981 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1981/34] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2041348 [ ] (OFFERGELD KASPAR, et al); | DE2021640 [ ] |