EP0032959 - Method and falsework for constructing bridges of prestressed concrete [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/31] | Process and falsework for constructing bridges of reinforced concrete | ||
[1984/13] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 13.07.1989 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Emil Steidle GmbH. & Co. Alte Krauchenwieser Strasse 8 D-7480 Sigmaringen / DE | [1981/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schweer, Rainer, Dipl.-Ing. D-7480 Sigmaringen / DE | 02 /
Steidle-Sailer, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing. D-7480 Sigmaringen / DE | [1981/31] | Representative(s) | Wallach, Curt, et al Patentanwälte, Wallach, Koch, Dr. Haibach, Feldkamp, Postfach 12 11 20 D-80035 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/31] | Wallach, Curt, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte, Wallach, Koch, Dr. Haibach, Feldkamp, Postfach 12 11 20 D-80035 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 80100241.1 | 18.01.1980 | [1981/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0032959 | Date: | 05.08.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0032959 | Date: | 28.03.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.1980 | Classification | IPC: | E01D21/04, E01D21/02 | [1981/31] | CPC: |
E01D21/10 (EP);
E01D2101/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1981/31] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Lehrgerüstaufbau zur Herstellung von Spannbetonbrücken | [1984/13] | English: | Method and falsework for constructing bridges of prestressed concrete | [1984/13] | French: | Procédé et faux-oeuvre pour la construction de ponts en béton précontraint | [1984/13] |
Former [1981/31] | Verfahren und Lehrgerüst zur Herstellung von Stahlbetonbrücken | ||
Former [1981/31] | Process and falsework for constructing bridges of reinforced concrete | ||
Former [1981/31] | Procédé et faux-oeuvre pour la construction de ponts en béton armé | Examination procedure | 28.10.1981 | Examination requested [1982/01] | 14.10.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.09.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
18.08.1984
28.09.1984
ADMISSIBLE STRABAG Bau-AG Siegburger Strasse 241 5000 Köln 21 / DE Opponent's representative Hennicke, Albrecht, et al, et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Buschhoff Dipl.-Ing. Hennicke Dipl.-Ing. Vollbach Postfach 19 04 08 50501 Köln / DE | 02
30.11.1984
11.01.1985
ADMISSIBLE Dyckerhoff & Widmann AG Erdinger Landstrasse 1 D-8000 München 81 / DE Opponent's representative Patentanwälte Dr. Keller, Schwertfeger Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 20 80 76810 Landau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/07] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.08.1984
28.09.1984
ADMISSIBLE STRABAG Bau-AG Siegburger Strasse 241 5000 Köln 21 / DE Opponent's representative Hennicke, Albrecht, Dipl.-Ing., et al, et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Buschhoff Dipl.-Ing. Hennicke Dipl.-Ing. Vollbach Postfach 19 04 08 D-50501 Köln / DE | ||
02
30.11.1984
11.01.1985
ADMISSIBLE Dyckerhoff & Widmann AG Erdinger Landstrasse 1 D-8000 München 81 / DE Opponent's representative Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. F.W. Möll Dipl.-Ing. H.Ch. Bitterich Postfach 20 80 D-76810 Landau / DE | |||
Former [1984/43] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.08.1984
28.09.1984
ADMISSIBLE STRABAG Bau-AG Siegburger Strasse 241 5000 Köln 21 / DE Opponent's representative Hennicke, Albrecht, Dipl.-Ing., et al, et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Buschhoff Dipl.-Ing. Hennicke Dipl.-Ing. Vollbach Postfach 19 04 08 D-50501 Köln / DE | 06.02.1985 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 13.06.1985 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.06.1985 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M03) | 28.10.1985 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 28.12.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.1988 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 04.04.1989 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 14.04.1989 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1989/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.04.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.02.1982 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   08.04.1982 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.01.1985 | GB | 18.01.1986 | SE | 19.01.1986 | BE | 31.01.1986 | NL | 01.08.1986 | AT | 18.01.1988 | [2015/21] |
Former [1999/52] | LU | 31.01.1985 | |
GB | 18.01.1986 | ||
SE | 19.01.1986 | ||
BE | 31.01.1986 | ||
NL | 01.08.1986 | ||
AT | 18.01.1988 | ||
CH | 31.01.1988 | ||
Former [1991/51] | GB | 18.01.1986 | |
SE | 19.01.1986 | ||
BE | 31.01.1986 | ||
NL | 01.08.1986 | ||
AT | 18.01.1988 | ||
CH | 31.01.1988 | ||
Former [1989/27] | GB | 18.01.1986 | |
SE | 19.01.1986 | ||
NL | 01.08.1986 | ||
AT | 18.01.1988 | ||
CH | 31.01.1988 | ||
Former [1989/14] | SE | 19.01.1986 | |
NL | 01.08.1986 | ||
AT | 18.01.1988 | ||
Former [1989/13] | NL | 01.08.1986 | |
AT | 18.01.1988 | ||
Former [1988/31] | NL | 01.08.1986 | Documents cited: | Search | DD61564 [ ]; | AT230931B [ ] (POLENSKY & ZOELLNER [DE]); | DE1201384 [ ] (ADOLF LUPP K G, et al); | DE1234759 [ ] (POLENSKY & ZOELLNER); | DE2436088 [ ] (PEINER MASCH SCHRAUBEN); | DE2533734 [ ] (KUNZ ALFRED & CO) | [ ] - HOCH- U. TIEFBAU, November 1971 M. SCHALE "Vorfahrgeruste" * Seiten 68 bis 72 * | Examination | - Wittfoht: Triumph der Spannweiten, Betonverlag Düsseldorf Seiten 230-232 |