EP0013966 - Supporting device for the painting of vehicle body elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schechtl, Max Rheingoldstrasse 6 D-8014 Neubiberg / DE | [1980/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1980/16] | Representative(s) | Grupe, Peter, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne-Grupe-Pellmann Bavariaring 4 D-8000 München 2 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/16] | Grupe, Peter, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne-Grupe-Pellmann Bavariaring 4 D-8000 München 2 / DE | Application number, filing date | 80100290.8 | 21.01.1980 | [1980/16] | Priority number, date | DE19790002030U | 25.01.1979 Original published format: DE 7902030 U | [1980/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0013966 | Date: | 06.08.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0013966 | Date: | 15.12.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.1980 | Classification | IPC: | B60S5/00, B05C13/02 | [1980/16] | CPC: |
B05B13/0285 (EP);
B05C13/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1980/16] | Title | German: | Halterungsvorrichtung für das Lackieren von Kraftfahrzeug-Karosserieteilen | [1980/16] | English: | Supporting device for the painting of vehicle body elements | [1980/16] | French: | Dispositif de support pour peindre des parties de carrosserie de véhicules automobiles | [1980/16] | Examination procedure | 26.01.1981 | Examination requested [1981/14] | 02.10.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 25.06.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.09.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 15.12.1982 | SE | 15.12.1982 | [1983/43] | Documents cited: | Search | DE7337253U [ ]; | DE804772 [ ] (ALBERT FUCHS); | CH281530 [ ] (EHRENSPERGER KARL [CH]); | CH376035 [ ] (MICHEL ERNST [CH]); | FR1380608 [ ]; | CH403575 [ ] (FROEHLICH ALBERT [CH]); | DE2221089 [ ] |