EP0016907 - Preparation for making wool shrink-proof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Th. Goldschmidt AG Goldschmidtstrasse 100 45127 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/21] | For all designated states Th. Goldschmidt AG Goldschmidtstrasse 100 D-45127 Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koerner, Götz, Dr. Kantorie 126 D-4300 Essen / DE | 02 /
Nickel, Friedhelm Lortzingstrasse 10 D-4300 Essen / DE | 03 /
Schmidt, Günter, Dr. Ahornstrasse 47 D-4300 Essen / DE | [1980/21] | Application number, filing date | 80100297.3 | 22.01.1980 | [1980/21] | Priority number, date | GB19790010341 | 23.03.1979 Original published format: GB 7910341 | [1980/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0016907 | Date: | 15.10.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0016907 | Date: | 18.03.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0016907 | Date: | 17.02.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.1981 | Classification | IPC: | D06M15/66 | [1980/21] | CPC: |
D06M15/647 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1980/21] | Title | German: | Zubereitung zum Schrumpffestmachen von Wolle | [1980/21] | English: | Preparation for making wool shrink-proof | [1980/21] | French: | Produit antifeutrant pour laine | [1980/21] | Examination procedure | 04.02.1981 | Examination requested [1981/16] | 05.08.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.08.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.11.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1594953 (ROTTA CHEM FAB THEODOR); | [A]FR1578772 ; | [D]DE1769249 (DOW CORNING) |