EP0016932 - Hinged connection for a shower separation wall [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baus, Heinz Georg Ulmenweg 46 CH-3601 Thun / CH | [1980/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1980/21] | Representative(s) | Klose, Hans Rechts- und Patentanwälte, Reble & Klose, Bereich Patente & Marken, Postfach 12 15 19 68066 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/23] | Klose, Hans, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwälte Klose & Schmitt, Kurfürstenstrasse 32 D-67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [1980/21] | Klose, Hans, Dipl.-Phys. Kurfürstenstrasse 32 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 80100555.4 | 04.02.1980 | [1980/21] | Priority number, date | DE19792913914 | 06.04.1979 Original published format: DE 2913914 | [1980/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0016932 | Date: | 15.10.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0016932 | Date: | 10.12.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0016932 | Date: | 09.06.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.10.1980 | Classification | IPC: | E05D7/08, A47K3/22, E06B3/48 | [1980/21] | CPC: |
E06B3/485 (EP);
A47K3/36 (EP);
E05D15/26 (EP);
E05D7/081 (EP);
E05Y2900/114 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, FR, GB, IT [1980/21] | Title | German: | Scharnierverbindung für eine Duschtrennwand | [1980/21] | English: | Hinged connection for a shower separation wall | [1980/21] | French: | Liaison articulée pour une paroi de séparation d'une douche | [1980/21] | Examination procedure | 13.12.1980 | Examination requested [1981/10] | 13.07.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.08.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.11.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.03.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB1013091 [ ] (REYNOLDS METALS CO); | US3670797 [ ] (SASSANO JOHN H); | US3813730 [ ] (SMITH L); | [A]DE2314446 (BAUS HEINZ GEORG); | [E]EP0012150 (PAS PATENT ADMINI SERVICE [DE]) |