EP0017712 - Process and device for measuring the solid-particle content in a fluid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.1986 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR State(s) deleted from list of lapses: GB | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EPCO Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung für Handel und Verwaltung Am alten Schacht 8 D-4100 Duisburg 17 / DE | [1982/31] |
Former [1980/22] | For all designated states Ihle Ingenieurgesellschaft mbH Am Hackenbruch 45 D-4000 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schniewind, Manfred Emdenstrasse 21 D-4300 Essen 1 / DE | [1980/22] | Representative(s) | Bonsmann, Manfred Kaldenkirchener Strasse 35a 41063 Mönchengladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/31] | Bonsmann, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing. Kaldenkirchener Strasse 35a D-41063 Mönchengladbach / DE | ||
Former [1980/22] | Cohausz, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. Schumannstrasse 97 D-4000 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 80100598.4 | 06.02.1980 | [1980/22] | Priority number, date | DE19792913058 | 31.03.1979 Original published format: DE 2913058 | [1980/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0017712 | Date: | 29.10.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0017712 | Date: | 28.08.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.1980 | Classification | IPC: | G01N15/04, C02F3/00, G01N33/18 | [1980/22] | CPC: |
G01N15/04 (EP,US);
G01N33/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1980/22] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Messung des Feststoffgehaltes einer Flüssigkeit | [1980/22] | English: | Process and device for measuring the solid-particle content in a fluid | [1980/22] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la mesure de la concentration en impuretés solides d'un fluide | [1980/22] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 28.04.1981 | Examination requested [1981/28] | 11.12.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 05.08.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.08.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.05.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.01.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.03.1982 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   13.07.1982 | 28.02.1985 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   07.05.1985 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 28.08.1985 | FR | 28.08.1985 | IT | 28.08.1985 | NL | 28.08.1985 | SE | 30.08.1985 | AT | 06.02.1986 | CH | 28.02.1986 | [2002/24] |
Former [1999/42] | BE | 28.08.1985 | |
IT | 28.08.1985 | ||
NL | 28.08.1985 | ||
SE | 30.08.1985 | ||
AT | 06.02.1986 | ||
GB | 06.02.1986 | ||
CH | 28.02.1986 | ||
Former [1989/27] | BE | 28.08.1985 | |
NL | 28.08.1985 | ||
SE | 30.08.1985 | ||
AT | 06.02.1986 | ||
GB | 06.02.1986 | ||
CH | 28.02.1986 | ||
Former [1989/22] | BE | 28.08.1985 | |
NL | 28.08.1985 | ||
SE | 30.08.1985 | ||
AT | 06.02.1986 | ||
CH | 28.02.1986 | ||
Former [1989/08] | BE | 28.08.1985 | |
NL | 28.08.1985 | ||
SE | 30.08.1985 | ||
AT | 06.02.1986 | ||
Former [1988/13] | BE | 28.08.1985 | |
NL | 28.08.1985 | ||
SE | 30.08.1985 | ||
Former [1988/04] | BE | 28.08.1985 | |
NL | 28.08.1985 | ||
Former [1986/35] | NL | 28.08.1985 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE1498715 (EMSCHERGENOSSENSCHAFT); | [A]FR2114296 (GUIGUES FREDERIC); | US3714445 [ ] (BLACHERE H, et al); | [A]US3953136 (HACH CLIFFORD C); | [A]GB1451661 (ENGLISH CLAYS LOVERING POCHIN) |