EP0016938 - Sheet transfer cylinder in rotary printing machines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 10 29 40 69019 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/21] | For all designated states Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 Postfach 10 29 40 D-69019 Heidelberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jeschke, Willi Berghalde 68 D-6900 Heidelberg / DE | [1980/21] | Representative(s) | Stoltenberg, Heinz-Herbert Baldo c/o Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/21] | Stoltenberg, Baldo Heinz-Herbert c/o Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 D-69115 Heidelberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 80100684.2 | 11.02.1980 | [1980/21] | Priority number, date | DE19792914362 | 09.04.1979 Original published format: DE 2914362 | [1980/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0016938 | Date: | 15.10.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0016938 | Date: | 09.02.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.1980 | Classification | IPC: | B41F21/00 | [1980/21] | CPC: |
B41F21/00 (EP,US);
B41F22/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1980/21] | Title | German: | Bogentransporttrommel an Rotationsdruckmaschinen | [1980/21] | English: | Sheet transfer cylinder in rotary printing machines | [1980/21] | French: | Cylindre de transfert de feuilles dans des machines à imprimer rotatives | [1980/21] | Examination procedure | 13.11.1980 | Examination requested [1981/04] | 25.11.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.08.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.11.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 28.02.1983 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | DE728119 [ ] (PLANETA DRUCKMASCHINENWERK AG); | FR1140267 [ ] (NEBIOLO SPA) |