EP0015416 - Modular block for osmotic separation processes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/19] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
von Bonin, Wulf, Dr. Mendelssohnstrasse 30 D-5090 Leverkusen / DE | 02 /
Lahrs, Jürgen, Dr. Volberger Weg 11 D-5000 Köln 91 / DE | 03 /
Born, Eberhard Im Oberiddelsfeld 7 D-5000 Köln 80 / DE | [1980/19] | Application number, filing date | 80100748.5 | 14.02.1980 | [1980/19] | Priority number, date | DE19792907319 | 24.02.1979 Original published format: DE 2907319 | [1980/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0015416 | Date: | 17.09.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0015416 | Date: | 09.09.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.1980 | Classification | IPC: | B01D13/00 | [1980/19] | CPC: |
B01D65/00 (EP,US);
B01D63/084 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1980/19] | Title | German: | Modulblock für osmotische Trennverfahren | [1980/19] | English: | Modular block for osmotic separation processes | [1980/19] | French: | Bloc modulaire pour procédés de séparation osmotique | [1980/19] | Examination procedure | 14.02.1980 | Examination requested [1980/19] | 03.12.1980 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.03.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.07.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | AU412451B [ ]; | DE2632044 [ ] (GAMBRO AG); | DE2650341 [ ] (BAYER AG); | DE2717048 [ ] (SCHLEICHER & SCHUELL CARL) |