EP0014971 - Process for the preparation of 1-alpha-hydroxy dehydroepiandrosterone [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE & CO. Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 3255 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1980/18] | For all designated states F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE & CO. Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 3255 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujiwara, Akiko 1059-7 Fueta Kamakura-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Miyamoto, Chikara 505 Marumo Building 250 Kuden-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Okuda, Toru 74 Yakuoji-machi Ichigaya Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [1980/18] | Representative(s) | Wuesthoff, Franz, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/18] | Wuesthoff, Franz, Dr.-Ing., et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 80100768.3 | 14.02.1980 | [1980/18] | Priority number, date | CH19790001540 | 16.02.1979 Original published format: CH 154079 | [1980/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0014971 | Date: | 03.09.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0014971 | Date: | 16.06.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.1980 | Classification | IPC: | C12P33/06, C07J1/00, // C12R1/66, C12R1/80 | [1982/24] | CPC: |
C07J1/0011 (EP);
C12P33/06 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1980/18] | C12P33/06, C07J1/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT [1980/18] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von 1-alpha-Hydroxydehydroepiandrosteron | [1980/18] | English: | Process for the preparation of 1-alpha-hydroxy dehydroepiandrosterone | [1980/18] | French: | Procédé de préparation de 1-alpha-hydroxy déhydroépiandrostérone | [1980/18] | Examination procedure | 14.02.1980 | Examination requested [1980/18] | 15.07.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.09.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 25.11.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.03.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2287909 [ ] | [ ] - JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, Band 79, 20. Juli 1957, Columbus, Ohio, US, R.M. DODSON et al.: "Microbiological hydroxylation of C19-steroids at positions C-1 and C-2"Seite 3921 * Seite 3921 * |