EP0017006 - Plaster for epicutaneous tests [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 05.11.1986 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.1986 | Opposition rejected | published on 30.12.1986 [1986/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HERMAL-CHEMIE KURT HERRMANN Scholtzstrasse 3 Postfach 1228 D-2057 Reinbeck bei Hamburg / DE | [1984/14] |
Former [1980/21] | For all designated states Schmücking, Carl-Günther, Dr. med. Caspar-Voght-Strasse 79 D-2000 Hamburg 26 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmücking, Carl-Günther, Dr. med verstorben | [1984/14] |
Former [1980/21] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/37] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | ||
Former [1980/21] | Vossius-Vossius-Tauchner-Heunemann-Rauh Patentanwälte P.O.Box 860767 Siebertstrasse 4 D-8000 München 86 / DE | Application number, filing date | 80101179.2 | 07.03.1980 | [1980/21] | Priority number, date | DE19792909071 | 08.03.1979 Original published format: DE 2909071 | [1980/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0017006 | Date: | 15.10.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0017006 | Date: | 22.02.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.1980 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/02, A61B10/00 | [1980/21] | CPC: |
A61B10/0035 (EP);
A61F2013/00434 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1980/21] | Title | German: | Epikutantestpflaster | [1980/21] | English: | Plaster for epicutaneous tests | [1980/21] | French: | Emplâtre pour tests épicutanés | [1980/21] | Examination procedure | 09.04.1981 | Examination requested [1981/25] | 16.03.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.09.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.07.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.11.1984
22.01.1985
ADMISSIBLE LOHMANN GmbH & Co KG Irlicher Strasse 55 D-56567 Neuwied / DE Opponent's representative Reitzner, Bruno Splanemann Reitzner Baronetzky Westendorp Patentanwälte Rumfordstrasse 7 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/13] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.11.1984
22.01.1985
ADMISSIBLE LOHMANN GmbH & Co KG Irlicher Strasse 55 D-56567 Neuwied / DE Opponent's representative Reitzner, Bruno, Dr. Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. R. Splanemann Dr. B. Reitzner Tal 13 D-80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1985/05] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.11.1984
LOHMANN GmbH & Co KG Irlicher Strasse 55 D-56567 Neuwied / DE Opponent's representative Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. R. Splanemann Dr. B. Reitzner Dipl.-Ing. K. Baronetzky Tal 13 D-80331 München / DE | 23.01.1985 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 03.06.1985 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 12.06.1985 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 16.08.1985 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 03.04.1986 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 09.08.1986 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1986/52] | Appeal following opposition | 03.06.1986 | Appeal received No. T0195/86 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE146315 ; | [A]US2190745 (HERMANN VOLLMER); | [A]US2235436 (LAUB STANLEY V); | [A]CH373140 (NAT RES DEV [GB]); | [A]US3212495 (OSBOURN RAYMOND A, et al); | [A]US3894531 (SAUNDERS JR MILTON A); | DE2444379 [ ] (BAUMGARTNER); | [D]DE2755838 (MERIEUX INST) |