EP0016395 - Mechanical/electrical controlling apparatus to shift an object [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.05.1983 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/20] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hölzer, Georg, Dipl.-Ing. Kellergasse 18 D-8521 Möhrendorf / DE | 02 /
Knoche, Jochem, Dipl.-Ing. Hansengarten 19 D-8500 Nürnberg / DE | [1980/20] | Application number, filing date | 80101218.8 | 10.03.1980 | [1980/20] | Priority number, date | DE19792910012 | 14.03.1979 Original published format: DE 2910012 | [1980/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0016395 | Date: | 01.10.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0016395 | Date: | 13.05.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.1981 | Classification | IPC: | G05D3/00, G01B3/22, H04N5/22, A61B10/00 | [1981/19] | CPC: |
G01R13/30 (EP,US);
G01S7/62 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1980/20] | G05D3/10, G01B3/22, H04N5/22, A61B10/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, FR, GB, NL [1980/20] | Title | German: | Mechanisch/elektrische Steuervorrichtung zum Verschieben eines Gegenstandes | [1980/20] | English: | Mechanical/electrical controlling apparatus to shift an object | [1980/20] | French: | Dispositif de commande mécanique/électrique pour le déplacement d'un objet | [1980/20] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 15.04.1981 | Examination requested [1981/27] | 29.04.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.05.1983 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1983/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2417484 (TELECTRON GMBH FUER ELEKTRONIS); | DE2114655 [ ] (INDRAMAT GMBH); | [D]DE2719118 (KRETZTECHNIK GMBH); | DE1563733 [ ]; | DE2309769 [ ] (LICENTIA GMBH); | [A]DE2623093 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO) |