EP0018561 - Process for the stabilization of blood clotting factors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1980/23] | Blood clotting factors and process for their stabilization | ||
[1986/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.1987 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.07.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.09.1987 [1987/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BEHRINGWERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Postfach 1140 D-3550 Marburg/Lahn / DE | [1980/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schwinn, Horst, Dr. Stümpelstal 27 D-3550 Marburg/Lahn / DE | 02 /
Heimburger, Norbert, Dr. Sonnenhang 10 D-3550 Marburg/Lahn / DE | 03 /
Kumpe, Gerhardt Aspherfeld 14 D-3552 Wetter / DE | 04 /
Herchenhan, Bernd Im Brand 33 D-3570 Kirchhain / DE | [1980/23] | Representative(s) | Meyer-Dulheuer, Karl-Hermann, et al Dr. Meyer- Dulheuer & Partners LLP Franklinstrasse 61-63 60486 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/23] | Meyer-Dulheuer, Karl-Hermann, Dr., et al Hoechst AG, Werk Kalle-Albert, Zentrale Patentabteilung KA D-65174 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 80102105.6 | 18.04.1980 | [1980/23] | Priority number, date | DE19792916711 | 25.04.1979 Original published format: DE 2916711 | [1980/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0018561 | Date: | 12.11.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0018561 | Date: | 21.10.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0018561 | Date: | 24.09.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.1981 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/16, A61K35/50, A61K37/47, A61K37/475, A61K37/64 | [1980/23] | CPC: |
C12N9/1044 (EP,US);
A61K31/14 (EP,US);
A61K35/14 (EP,US);
A61K38/005 (EP,US);
A61K38/48 (EP,US);
A61L2/0023 (EP,US);
A61L2/04 (EP,US);
C07K14/75 (EP,US);
C07K14/755 (EP,US);
C07K14/8128 (EP,US);
C12N9/6429 (EP,US);
C12N9/6435 (EP,US);
C12Y304/21005 (EP,US);
C12Y304/21007 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1980/23] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Stabilisierung von Blutgerinnungsfaktoren | [1986/39] | English: | Process for the stabilization of blood clotting factors | [1986/39] | French: | Procédé pour la stabilisation des facteurs de coagulation du sang | [1986/39] |
Former [1980/23] | Blutgerinnungsfaktoren und Verfahren zu ihrer Stabilisierung | ||
Former [1980/23] | Blood clotting factors and process for their stabilization | ||
Former [1980/23] | Facteurs de coagulation du sang et procédé pour leur stabilisation | Examination procedure | 06.04.1982 | Examination requested [1982/24] | 11.10.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 21.01.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.03.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 28.09.1985 | Appeal received | 28.09.1985 | Statement of grounds filed | Opposition(s) | 25.06.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB941019 [ ] (CROOKES LAB LTD); | DE2653534 [ ] (BAXTER TRAVENOL LAB); | [P]BE877439 (GREEN CROSS CORP) |