EP0018006 - Insulation for the roof or wall of a building and method of its installation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.05.1984 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commercial Hydraulics A.G. Tribschenstrasse 78 6000 Luzern / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1980/22] | For all designated states Commercial Hydraulics A.G. Tribschenstrasse 78 CH-6000 Luzern / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schugk, Wolfgang CH-8934 Knonau / CH | [1980/22] | Representative(s) | Blum, Rudolf Emil, et al E. BLUM & Co. AG Patent- und Markenanwälte VSP Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1984/05] | Blum, Rudolf Emil Ernst, et al c/o E. Blum & Co Patentanwälte Vorderberg 11 CH-8044 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [1980/22] | Blum, Rudolf Emil Ernst c/o E. BLUM & CO. Vorderberg 11 CH-8044 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 80102121.3 | 19.04.1980 | [1980/22] | Priority number, date | CH19790003840 | 24.04.1979 Original published format: CH 384079 | [1980/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0018006 | Date: | 29.10.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0018006 | Date: | 11.02.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0018006 | Date: | 22.06.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.1980 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/76 | [1980/22] | CPC: |
E04B1/7658 (EP);
E04B1/70 (EP);
E04D13/1625 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1980/22] | Title | German: | Isolation für Dach oder Wand eines Gebäudes und Verfahren zum Montieren derselben | [1980/22] | English: | Insulation for the roof or wall of a building and method of its installation | [1980/22] | French: | Isolation pour le toit ou le mur d'un bâtiment et procédé pour son montage | [1980/22] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 22.05.1981 | Examination requested [1981/31] | 23.08.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.11.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.03.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 22.06.1983 | [2007/44] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 22.06.1983 | Documents cited: | Search | US2839789 [ ] (ADAMS HORACE B); | [A]US2999278 (SPENCER WILLIAM H, et al); | [A]US3121649 (OLIVER ROBERT E); | [A]US3513614 (STUDZINSKI JAMES D); | US4014150 [ ] (WELLS DAVID LEE, et al) |