EP0019102 - Process for the dyeing or printing and simultaneously finishing of textiles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 20.05.1987 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/24] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baumgarte, Ulrich, Dr. Hardenburgstrasse 18 D-6703 Limburgerhof / DE | 02 /
Petersen, Harro, Dr. Kalmitstrasse 23 D-6710 Frankenthal / DE | [1980/24] | Application number, filing date | 80102132.0 | 21.04.1980 | [1980/24] | Priority number, date | DE19792916672 | 25.04.1979 Original published format: DE 2916672 | DE19792916678 | 25.04.1979 Original published format: DE 2916678 | [1980/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0019102 | Date: | 26.11.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0019102 | Date: | 27.04.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.1980 | Classification | IPC: | D06P3/60, D06M15/54, D06M15/58 | [1983/17] | CPC: |
D06P3/6033 (EP);
D06M15/423 (EP);
D06P3/8233 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1980/24] | D06P3/60, D06P3/82, D06M15/54, D06M15/58 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1981/06] |
Former [1980/24] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Färben oder Bedrucken und gleichzeitigen Ausrüsten von Textilien | [1980/24] | English: | Process for the dyeing or printing and simultaneously finishing of textiles | [1980/24] | French: | Procédé pour le teinture ou l'impression et l'ennoblissement simultané de matières textiles | [1980/24] | Examination procedure | 28.08.1980 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) LU | 08.11.1980 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.11.1980 | Examination requested [1981/06] | 15.06.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.02.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.08.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
24.01.1984
12.03.1984
ADMISSIBLE Chemische Fabrik Pfersee GmbH Rehlinger Str. 1 D-86462 Langweid a. Lech / DE | [1984/13] | 12.03.1984 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 05.05.1984 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.07.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 14.09.1984 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 03.04.1987 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 16.04.1987 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1987/28] | Appeal following opposition | 25.01.1985 | Appeal received No. T0033/85 | 22.03.1985 | Statement of grounds filed | 02.09.1986 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1986/36] | 16.10.1986 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1986/42] | 03.04.1987 | Result of appeal procedure: REVOCATION OF PATENT AT PROPRIETOR'S REQUEST | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.05.1980 | LU   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2015/21] |
Former [1989/24] | CH | 27.04.1983 | |
LI | 27.04.1983 | Documents cited: | Search | FR1456577 [ ] (CIBA GEIGY); | DE2700150 [ ] (BAYER AG); | GB1514504 [ ] (MILNE F); | DE2521595 [ ] (PFERSEE CHEM FAB); | GB1441641 [ ] (ICI LTD) |