EP0019112 - Process for the preparation of cyclic acetals of trans-4-chloro-3-methyl-2-buten-1-al and preparation of trans-3-methyl-2-buten-1,4-dial-monoacetals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/24] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jaedicke, Hagen, Dr. Budapester Strasse 49 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02 /
Paust, Joachim, Dr. Ringstrasse 3 D-6701 Neuhofen / DE | [1980/24] | Application number, filing date | 80102184.1 | 23.04.1980 | [1980/24] | Priority number, date | DE19792917413 | 28.04.1979 Original published format: DE 2917413 | [1980/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0019112 | Date: | 26.11.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0019112 | Date: | 17.11.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.1980 | Classification | IPC: | C07D319/06 | [1980/24] | CPC: |
C07D319/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1981/04] |
Former [1980/24] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von cyclischen Acetalen von trans-4-Chlor-3-methyl-2-buten-1-al sowie von trans-3-Methyl-2-buten-1,4-dial-1-monoacetalen | [1980/24] | English: | Process for the preparation of cyclic acetals of trans-4-chloro-3-methyl-2-buten-1-al and preparation of trans-3-methyl-2-buten-1,4-dial-monoacetals | [1980/24] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation d'acétals cycliques de trans-4-chloro-3-méthyl-2-butén-1-al et préparation de trans-3-méthyl-2-butén-1,4-dial-monoacétals | [1980/24] | Examination procedure | 18.08.1980 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, IT, LU, SE | 29.10.1980 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.02.1981 | Examination requested [1981/16] | 22.02.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.04.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.05.1980 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 23.05.1980 | IT   M02   Not yet paid | 23.05.1980 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 23.05.1980 | SE   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2357752 [ ] (BASF AG); | DE2513999 [ ] (BASF AG); | DE2225612 [ ] (BASF AG) |