EP0024473 - Application of a group of dioxa-alkyl-tricyclododecenes as perfumes; perfuming compositions containing them; dioxa-alkyl-tricyclododecenes belonging to this group [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/10] | Application of a group of dioxa-alkyl-tricyclododecenes as perfumes; perfuming compositions containing them; process for the preparation of these chemicals; dioxa-alkyl-tricyclododecenes belonging to this group | ||
[1984/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.1985 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.06.1985 [1985/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/21] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1981/10] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien -Patentabteilung- Postfach 1100 Henkelstrasse 67 D-4000 Düsseldorf 1 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Conrad, Jens, Dr. Dürerweg 15 D-4010 Hilden / DE | 02 /
Upadek, Horst, Dr. Kempenweg 18 a D-4006 Erkrath / DE | 03 /
Bruns, Klaus, Dr. Notburgaweg 6 D-4150 Krefeld / DE | [1981/10] | Application number, filing date | 80102283.1 | 28.04.1980 | [1981/10] | Priority number, date | DE19792918168 | 05.05.1979 Original published format: DE 2918168 | [1981/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0024473 | Date: | 11.03.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0024473 | Date: | 17.03.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0024473 | Date: | 20.06.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C11B9/00, C07D321/10 | [1981/10] | CPC: |
C07D321/10 (EP,US);
C07D321/06 (EP,US);
C11B9/0084 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1984/03] |
Former [1981/10] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE | Title | German: | Verwendung einer Gruppe von Dioxa-alkyl-tricyclododecenen als Riechstoffe; diese enthaltende Riechstoffkompositionen; neue Dioxa-alkyl-tricyclododecene dieser Gruppe | [1984/25] | English: | Application of a group of dioxa-alkyl-tricyclododecenes as perfumes; perfuming compositions containing them; dioxa-alkyl-tricyclododecenes belonging to this group | [1984/25] | French: | Utilisation d'un groupe de dioxa-alkyl-tricyclododécènes comme parfums; compositions parfumantes contenant ces derniers; dioxa-alkyl-tricyclo-dodécènes appartenant à ce groupe | [1984/25] |
Former [1981/10] | Verwendung einer Gruppe von Dioxa-alkyl-tricyclododecenen als Riechstoffe; diese enthaltende Riechstoffkompositionen; ein Verfahren zur Herstellung dieser Chemikalien; neue Dioxa-alkyl-tricyclododecene dieser Gruppe | ||
Former [1981/10] | Application of a group of dioxa-alkyl-tricyclododecenes as perfumes; perfuming compositions containing them; process for the preparation of these chemicals; dioxa-alkyl-tricyclododecenes belonging to this group | ||
Former [1981/10] | Utilisation d'un groupe de dioxa-alkyl-tricyclododécènes comme parfums; compositions parfumantes contenant ces derniers; un procédé de préparation de ces produits chimiques dioxa-alkyl-tricyclo-dodécènes appartenant à ce groupe | Examination procedure | 22.07.1981 | Examination requested [1981/39] | 09.02.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 25.10.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.03.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB869485 [ ] (BAYER AG); | US3799892 [ ] (STEPHENS C, et al); | LU78181 [ ] (FIRMENICH & CIE [CH]) | [ ] - BULLETIN DE LA SOCIETE CHIMIQUE DE FRANCE, Juli-August 1975, Seiten 1763-1766 Paris, FR. J: Soulier et al.: "Synthèse de dihydro-4,7- dioxépinnes-1,3 et de systeèmes polycycliques contenant de noyau du dioxépanne-1,3(Note de Labora- toire)" * Seite 1763, II; Seite 1765, T. IV * |