EP0022155 - Method and device for the manufacture of bevel wheels [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabel- und Metallwerke Gutehoffnungshütte Aktiengesellschaft Kabelkamp 20 Postfach 260 D-3000 Hannover 1 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/02] | For all designated states Kabel- und Metallwerke Gutehoffnungshütte Aktiengesellschaft Kabelkamp 20 Postfach 260 D-3000 Hannover 1 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leykamm, Herbert, Dipl.-Ing. Peter-Henlein-Strasse 30 D-8560 Lauf / DE | 02 /
Knabel, Siegfried Steiglehner Strasse 23 D-8500 Nürnberg / DE | [1981/02] | Application number, filing date | 80102324.3 | 30.04.1980 | [1981/02] | Priority number, date | DE19792927135 | 05.07.1979 Original published format: DE 2927135 | [1981/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0022155 | Date: | 14.01.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0022155 | Date: | 27.10.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.1980 | Classification | IPC: | B21K1/30 | [1981/02] | CPC: |
B21K1/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT, SE [1981/02] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von Kegelzahnrädern | [1981/02] | English: | Method and device for the manufacture of bevel wheels | [1981/02] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la fabrication de roues dentées coniques | [1981/02] | Examination procedure | 05.12.1980 | Examination requested [1981/07] | 03.07.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.05.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.07.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2742310 [ ] (GLEASON WORKS); | US3842646 [ ] (KUHN H); | DE2446413 [ ]; | DE2320336 [ ] (KABEL METALLWERKE GHH) |