EP0019799 - Apparatus for registering working condition data, in particular of a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1980/25] | Apparatus and system for registering working condition data, in particular of a vehicle | ||
[1985/35] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.1986 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.08.1986 [1986/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/25] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fredrich, Joachim Schlossstrasse 45 D-6431 Hohenroda 1 / DE | 02 /
Klusacek, Michael Rotlinstrasse 22 D-6000 Frankfurt/Main / DE | 03 /
Fredrich, Detlef Schlossstrasse 45 D-6431 Hohenroda 1 / DE | 04 /
Schrumpf, Carl-Eduard, Dipl.-Ing. Kleefeld D-8520 Erlangen / DE | [1980/25] | Application number, filing date | 80102664.2 | 13.05.1980 | [1980/25] | Priority number, date | DE19792921611 | 28.05.1979 Original published format: DE 2921611 | [1980/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0019799 | Date: | 10.12.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0019799 | Date: | 12.01.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0019799 | Date: | 28.08.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.1982 | Classification | IPC: | G07C5/08, G11B5/027 | [1982/51] | CPC: |
G11B15/005 (EP);
G07C5/0875 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1980/25] | G07C5/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, LI, NL [1980/25] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Registrieren von Betriebszustandsinformationen, insbesondere eines Fahrzeuges | [1985/35] | English: | Apparatus for registering working condition data, in particular of a vehicle | [1985/35] | French: | Dispositif pour l'enregistrement de données de fonctionnement, en particulier d'un véhicule | [1985/35] |
Former [1980/25] | Verfahren und Anordnung zum Registrieren von Betriebszustandsinformationen, insbesondere eines Fahrzeuges | ||
Former [1980/25] | Apparatus and system for registering working condition data, in particular of a vehicle | ||
Former [1980/25] | Dispositif et système pour l'enregistrement de données de fonctionnement, en particulier d'un véhicule | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 28.10.1981 | Examination requested [1982/01] | 13.06.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.08.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.12.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.05.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 28.08.1985 | [1986/35] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2089561 (LAPORT EDMUND A); | [A]US3792445 (BUCKS R, et al); | [A]CH559394 (TRACHSEL FRITZ); | [AD]DE2552685 (SIEMENS AG) |