EP0019816 - Flexible, continuous filling level detector for electrically conductive liquids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.09.1984 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTERATOM Internationale Atomreaktorbau GmbH Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse D-5060 Bergisch Gladbach 1 / DE | [1980/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hans, Rainer An der Wolfsmaar 6 D-5060 Bergisch Gladbach 3 / DE | 02 /
Cremer, Dieter Immekeppelerteich 8 D-5063 Overath / DE | [1980/25] | Representative(s) | Mehl, Ernst, et al Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/19] | Mehl, Ernst, Dipl.-Ing., et al Postfach 22 13 17 D-80503 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 80102734.3 | 16.05.1980 | [1980/25] | Priority number, date | DE19792922093 | 31.05.1979 Original published format: DE 2922093 | [1980/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0019816 | Date: | 10.12.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0019816 | Date: | 16.11.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.1980 | Classification | IPC: | G01F23/26 | [1980/25] | CPC: |
G01F23/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL [1980/25] | Title | German: | Flexibler, kontinuierlicher Füllstandsmesser für elektrisch leitende Flüssigkeiten | [1980/25] | English: | Flexible, continuous filling level detector for electrically conductive liquids | [1980/25] | French: | Détecteur de niveau continu et flexible pour liquides électriquement conducteurs | [1980/25] | Examination procedure | 13.04.1981 | Examination requested [1981/25] | 22.04.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.08.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 02.05.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.05.1984 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | DE2133318 [ ] (INTERATOM) | [ ] - SIEMENS ZEITSCHRIFT, Band 49, Nr. 2, 1975 Erlangen, DE, R. HANS: "Natrium-Fullstands-messeinrichtungen fur Kernkraftwerke", Seiten 73-77 * Bilder 2,3 * |