EP0021106 - Continuous-flow heater [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/01] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Neimanns, Nikolaus Dipl.-Phys. Giessener Strasse 12 D-6483 Salmünster / DE | [1981/01] | Application number, filing date | 80103006.5 | 29.05.1980 | [1981/01] | Priority number, date | DE19790016927U | 12.06.1979 Original published format: DE 7916927 U | [1981/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0021106 | Date: | 07.01.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0021106 | Date: | 04.02.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0021106 | Date: | 15.09.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.1980 | Classification | IPC: | F24H1/10, // F23K5/00 | [1982/37] | CPC: |
F24H1/102 (EP);
F23K5/20 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1981/01] | F24H1/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1981/01] | Title | German: | Durchlauferhitzer | [1981/01] | English: | Continuous-flow heater | [1981/01] | French: | Dispositif pour le chauffage instantanné d'un liquide à écoulement libre | [1982/37] |
Former [1981/01] | Chauffe-eau instantané | Examination procedure | 19.12.1980 | Examination requested [1981/10] | 15.12.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 17.03.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.06.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 30.05.1983 | CH | 31.05.1983 | LI | 31.05.1983 | [1984/28] |
Former [1984/21] | SE | 30.05.1983 | Documents cited: | Search | CH510848 [ ] (KOENIG HELMUT [AT]); | FR2360044 [ ] (FONDERIE SOC GEN DE [FR]); | [P]EP0009136 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) |