EP0021140 - Ion source in a vacuum chamber and method for its operation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.1984 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/01] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harper, James McKell Edwin 507 Elizabeth Road Yorktown Hgts, N.Y.10598 / US | 02 /
Kaufman, Harold Richard 401 Spinnaker Lane Fort Collins Colorado 80525 / US | [1981/01] | Representative(s) | Rudack, Günter Otto IBM Corporation Säumerstrasse 4 CH-8803 Rüschlikon / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1981/13] | Rudack, Günter O., Dipl.-Ing. IBM Corporation Säumerstrasse 4 CH-8803 Rüschlikon / CH | ||
Former [1981/01] | Aepli, Leo B., Dipl.-Ing. Säumerstrasse 4 CH-8803 Rüschlikon/ZH / CH | Application number, filing date | 80103077.6 | 03.06.1980 | [1981/01] | Priority number, date | US19790053491 | 29.06.1979 Original published format: US 53491 | [1981/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0021140 | Date: | 07.01.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0021140 | Date: | 24.08.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.1980 | Classification | IPC: | H01J27/00, H01L21/302 | [1981/01] | CPC: |
H01J37/08 (EP,US);
H01J27/14 (EP,US);
H01J37/3056 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1981/01] | Title | German: | Ionenquelle in einer Vakuumkammer und Verfahren zum Betrieb derselben | [1981/01] | English: | Ion source in a vacuum chamber and method for its operation | [1981/01] | French: | Source ionique dans une chambre sous vide et procédé pour son fonctionnement | [1981/01] | Examination procedure | 23.01.1981 | Examination requested [1981/14] | 15.02.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.11.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.05.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3156090 [ ] (KAUFMAN HAROLD R); | CH441532 [ ] (HALBLEITERWERK FRANKFURT ODER [DE]); | US3355615 [ ] (LE BIHAN RAYMOND, et al); | US3660715 [ ] (POST RICHARD F); | GB1298490 [ ] (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD [JP]); | US3744247 [ ] (MARGOSIAN P, et al); | GB1359707 [ ] (THOMSON CSF); | FR2218652 [ ] (THOMSON CSF [FR]); | GB1466786 [ ] (CALIFORNIA LINEAR CIRCUITS INC); | DE2625870 [ ] (SIEMENS AG); | GB1513218 [ ] (SIEMENS AG) |