EP0021148 - Method and device for interferometric measurement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 15.11.1983 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/01] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Makosch, Günter Stuttgarter Strasse 40 D-7032 Sindelfingen-Maichingen / DE | [1981/01] | Representative(s) | Teufel, Fritz IBM Deutschland Management & Business Support GmbH Patentwesen u. Urheberrecht 71137 Ehningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/38] | Teufel, Fritz IBM Deutschland Management & Business Support GmbH Patentwesen u. Urheberrecht 71137 Ehningen / DE | ||
Former [2008/37] | Teufel, Fritz IBM Deutschland GmbH Intellectual Property 70548 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1981/01] | Teufel, Fritz, Dipl.-Phys. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht Pascalstrasse 100 W-7000 Stuttgart 80 / DE | Application number, filing date | 80103087.5 | 03.06.1980 | [1981/01] | Priority number, date | DE19792925117 | 22.06.1979 Original published format: DE 2925117 | [1981/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0021148 | Date: | 07.01.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.1980 | Classification | IPC: | G01B9/02, G01B11/30 | [1981/01] | CPC: |
G01B11/306 (EP,US);
G01B9/02015 (EP,US);
G01B2290/70 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1981/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Einrichtung zur interferometrischen Messung | [1981/01] | English: | Method and device for interferometric measurement | [1981/01] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de mesure interférométrique | [1981/01] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 31.03.1981 | Examination requested [1981/23] | 10.12.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.12.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.04.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1984/03] | 07.10.1983 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1984/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB717233 [ ] (FRANCIS HUGHES SMITH, et al); | US3666371 [ ] (LANG HENDRIK DE); | DE2518047 [ ] (VICKERS LTD) |