EP0022937 - Loudspeaker with a multiple path diaphragm [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/04] | Multiple path diaphragm (with mechanical cross-over, multiple path spring and detectors for electronic counter coupling) | ||
[1983/43] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.1984 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Friz, Rainer Cornelius Pfarrgasse 2 D-8266 Egharting / DE | [1981/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1981/04] | Application number, filing date | 80103523.9 | 24.06.1980 | [1981/04] | Priority number, date | DE19792927848 | 10.07.1979 Original published format: DE 2927848 | [1981/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0022937 | Date: | 28.01.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0022937 | Date: | 26.10.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.1980 | Classification | IPC: | H04R7/06, H04R7/12, H04R3/00, H04R7/20 | [1981/04] | CPC: |
H04R7/122 (EP);
H04R7/06 (EP);
H04R7/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1981/04] | Title | German: | Lautsprecher mit Mehrwegmembrane | [1983/43] | English: | Loudspeaker with a multiple path diaphragm | [1983/43] | French: | Haut-parleur comportant une membrane à voie multiple | [1983/43] |
Former [1981/04] | Mehrwegmembrane (mit mechanischer Frequenzweiche, Mehrwegfeder und Istwertgebern für elektronische Gegenkopplung) | ||
Former [1981/04] | Multiple path diaphragm (with mechanical cross-over, multiple path spring and detectors for electronic counter coupling) | ||
Former [1981/04] | Membrane à voie multiple (à filtre d'aiguillage de fréquences mécanique, ressort à voie multiple et détecteurs pour contre-réaction électronique) | Examination procedure | 22.06.1981 | Examination requested [1981/36] | 23.04.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.12.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 30.12.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.04.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 27.07.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1983 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   17.08.1983 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 26.10.1983 | [2002/24] | Documents cited: | Search | GB329376 [ ]; | DE2751700 [ ]; | GB1350122 [ ]; | FR2296985 [ ]; | DE2752433 [ ]; | DE2626652 [ ] | [ ] - PRODUCT ENGINEERING, Band, 39, 15. Januar 1968 New York, US "Speaker inspired by violin is thin as a picture", Seiten 90-93. * Seite 91, linke Spalte, Zeile 14 bis mitte Spalte, Zeile 5; Figuren Seiten 90, 92 * | [ ] - JOURNAL OF THE AUDIO ENGINEERING SOCIETY, Band 5, Heft 1, Januar 1957, New York, US A.B. COHEN: "Mechanical crossover characteristics in dual diaphragm loudspeeakers", Seiten 11-17. * Vollstandig * |