EP0021402 - Integrated circuit board [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.1986 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.1987 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 27.01.1988 [1988/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/01] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miersch, Ekkehard F. NarzissenStrasse D-7030 Böblingen 4 / DE | 02 /
Romankiw, Lubomyr T. 7 Dunn Lane Briarcliff Manor New York 10510 / US | [1981/01] | Representative(s) | Ahlman, Bertel IBM Svenska AB Intellectual Property Department 163 92 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/32] | Ahlman, Bertel IBM Svenska AB Intellectual Property Department S-163 92 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1983/21] | Gasslander, Sten IBM Svenska AB Intellectual Property Department S-163 92 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1981/27] | Petersen, Richard Courtenay IBM United Kingdom Patent Operations Hursley Park Winchester Hants. SO21 2JN / GB | ||
Former [1981/01] | Grassi, Bruno c/o IBM Semea S.r.l. Direzione Relazioni con l'Industria MI-SEG 543 P.O. 137 I-20090 Segrate (Milano) / IT | Application number, filing date | 80103554.4 | 24.06.1980 | [1981/01] | Priority number, date | US19790053497 | 29.06.1979 Original published format: US 53497 | [1981/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0021402 | Date: | 07.01.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0021402 | Date: | 18.05.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0021402 | Date: | 09.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.1983 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/54, H01L23/14, H05K1/00 | [1983/16] | CPC: |
H05K3/4641 (EP,US);
H01L23/142 (EP,US);
H01L23/5385 (EP,US);
H01L2224/16225 (EP,US);
H05K1/113 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09309 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1981/01] | H01L23/54, H01L23/14 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1981/01] | Title | German: | Platte für integrierte Schaltung | [1981/01] | English: | Integrated circuit board | [1981/01] | French: | Panneau pour circuit intégré | [1981/01] | Examination procedure | 20.12.1982 | Examination requested [1983/09] | 15.06.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.03.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.07.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 09.10.1985 | [1988/04] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3351816 (SEAR BRIAN E, et al); | [A]US4047132 (KRAJEWSKI IGNACY); | [A]US3299393 (KELLEY GEORGE F, et al) | Examination | US3519959 | - IBM Journal of Research & Development, May 1969, pages 226-238 |