EP0021445 - Method for preparing zeolites, zeolites obtained by such method and their use for the conversion of hydrocarbons [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 30.01.1989 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.1989 | Revocation of patent | published on 22.03.1989 [1989/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Montedison S.p.A. Patents & Licensing Dept. Foro Buonaparte, 31 P.O. Box 10528 I-20121 Milan / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1981/01] | For all designated states Montedison S.p.A. Patents & Licensing Dept. Foro Buonaparte, 31 P.O. Box 10528 I-20121 Milan / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Le Van Mao, Raymond 77, Via Cenisio Milan / IT | 02 /
Pilati, Orlando 14, Via Valparaiso Milan / IT | 03 /
Moretti, Enrico 24, Via Matteotti Bollate, Milan / IT | 04 /
Covini, Romano 6, Via S.Simpliciano Milan / IT | 05 /
Genoni, Fausto 20, Via Giuseppe Verdi Samarate, Varese / IT | [1981/01] | Representative(s) | Barz, Peter, et al Schmied-Kowarzik & Partner Patentanwälte Siegfriedstrasse 8 80803 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/52] | Barz, Peter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dr. V. Schmied-Kowarzik Dipl.-Ing. G. Dannenberg Dr. P. Weinhold Dr. D. Gudel Dipl.-Ing. S. Schubert Dr. P. Barz Siegfriedstrasse 8 D-80803 München / DE | ||
Former [1985/04] | Schmied-Kowarzik, Volker, Dr. Patentanwälte Dr. V. Schmied-Kowarzik Dipl.-Ing. G. Dannenberg Dr. P. Weinhold Dr. D. Gudel Dipl.-Ing. S. Schubert Dr. P. Barz Siegfriedstrasse 8 D-80803 München / DE | ||
Former [1981/01] | Schmied-Kowarzik, Volker, Dr. Patentanwälte Dr. V. Schmied-Kowarzik Dipl.-Ing. G. Dannenberg Dr. P. Weinhold Dr. D. Gudel Dipl.-Ing. S. Schubert Siegfriedstrasse 8 D-8000 München 40 / DE | Application number, filing date | 80103669.0 | 27.06.1980 | [1981/01] | Priority number, date | IT19790023978 | 29.06.1979 Original published format: IT 2397879 | [1981/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0021445 | Date: | 07.01.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0021445 | Date: | 22.07.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0021445 | Date: | 18.01.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C01B33/28, B01J29/28, C10G11/05, C10G47/16, C10G35/095, C07C5/22, C07C5/41, C07C2/12, C07C2/54, C07C6/00, C07C4/10 | [1981/01] | CPC: |
C07C6/00 (EP,US);
B01J29/70 (EP,US);
B01J29/7049 (EP,US);
B01J29/76 (EP,US);
C01B39/023 (EP,US);
C07C2/54 (EP,US);
C07C4/06 (EP,US);
C07C4/08 (EP,US);
C07C5/2737 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C5/2737, C07C15/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1981/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Zeolithen, durch dieses Verfahren erhaltene Zeolithe und ihre Anwendung bei der Umwandlung von Kohlenwasserstoffen | [1981/01] | English: | Method for preparing zeolites, zeolites obtained by such method and their use for the conversion of hydrocarbons | [1981/01] | French: | Procédé de préparation de zéolites, zéolites obtenues selon ce procédé et leur utilisation dans la conversion d'hydrocarbures | [1981/01] | Examination procedure | 29.06.1981 | Examination requested [1981/37] | 18.02.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.07.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.06.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.10.1984
13.11.1984
ADMISSIBLE Mobil Oil Corporation 150 East 42nd Street New York, N.Y. 10017 / US Opponent's representative Cooper, John Anthony CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | 02
17.10.1984
13.11.1984
ADMISSIBLE Imperial Chemical Industries PLC Legal Department Patents PO Box 6 Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City Hertfordshire AL7 1HD / GB Opponent's representative Martin, David Lincoln Imperial Chemical Industries PLC Legal Department: Patents PO Box 6 Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City Herts, AL7 1HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/52] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.10.1984
13.11.1984
ADMISSIBLE Mobil Oil Corporation 150 East 42nd Street New York, N.Y. 10017 / US Opponent's representative Cooper, John Anthony CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
02
17.10.1984
13.11.1984
ADMISSIBLE Imperial Chemical Industries PLC Legal Department Patents PO Box 6 Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City Hertfordshire AL7 1HD / GB Opponent's representative Martin, David Lincoln Imperial Chemical Industries PLC Legal Department: Patents PO Box 6 Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City Herts, AL7 1HD / GB | 06.12.1984 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.08.1985 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.07.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 15.01.1987 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 05.05.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M03) | 28.08.1987 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 30.10.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 11.01.1988 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 25.02.1988 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.1988 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 19.10.1988 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 29.10.1988 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1989/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - HELVETICA CHEMICA ACTA, Vol. 57, Fascicule 6, 1974, Basel, CH W. SIEBER et al.: Formation and properties of Losod, a new sodium zeolite", page 1533-49. | Examination | US3702886 | EP0000432 |