EP0022502 - Laminate, method of its manufacture and use of silanes therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.03.1981 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Herberts Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Christbusch 25 42285 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/03] | For all designated states Herberts Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Christbusch 25 D-42285 Wuppertal / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heinrich, Siegfried Augustastrasse 84 D-5600 Wuppertal 1 / DE | 02 /
Kortwig, Bernd Mittelstrasse 14b D-4322 Sprockhövel / DE | 03 /
Lilienbeck, Klemens Hordenbachstrasse 50 D-5600 Wuppertal 21 / DE | 04 /
Ottmann, Gerhard F., Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Westfalenweg 308 D-5600 Wuppertal 1 / DE | 05 /
Stolzenbach, Heinrich, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Kottsiepen 83 D-5600 Wuppertal 21 / DE | 06 /
Wramba, Herbert Obere Lichtenplatzerstrasse 269a D-5600 Wuppertal 2 / DE | [1981/03] | Representative(s) | Türk, Dietmar, et al Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/03] | Türk, Dietmar, Dr. rer. nat., et al Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 80103676.5 | 28.06.1980 | [1981/03] | Priority number, date | DE19792926939 | 04.07.1979 Original published format: DE 2926939 | [1981/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0022502 | Date: | 21.01.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.1980 | Classification | IPC: | B32B15/08, B32B15/20 | [1981/03] | CPC: |
B32B15/08 (EP,US);
B32B15/20 (US);
B32B27/32 (US);
B32B27/36 (US);
B32B7/12 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1981/03] | Title | German: | Laminat, Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung und Verwendung von Silanen hierfür | [1981/03] | English: | Laminate, method of its manufacture and use of silanes therefor | [1981/03] | French: | Stratifié, procédé pour sa fabrication et utilisation de silanes pour cette fabrication | [1981/03] | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 27.02.1981 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1981/20] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2549227 [ ]; | GB1453621 [ ]; | DE1694750 [ ]; | US3649430 [ ]; | DE2162984 [ ] |