EP0022244 - Solar collector for sloping roofs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.07.1982 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEORG FISCHER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Mühlentalstrasse 105 CH-8201 Schaffhausen / CH | [1981/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hurter, Fritz Bocksrietstrasse 108 CH-8200 Schaffhausen / CH | [1981/02] | Application number, filing date | 80103757.3 | 02.07.1980 | [1981/02] | Priority number, date | CH19790006342 | 06.07.1979 Original published format: CH 634279 | [1981/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0022244 | Date: | 14.01.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.1980 | Classification | IPC: | F24J3/02, E04D13/00 | [1981/02] | CPC: |
F24S20/67 (EP);
Y02B10/20 (EP);
Y02E10/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, LI [1981/02] | Title | German: | Sonnenkollektor für schräge Dächer | [1981/02] | English: | Solar collector for sloping roofs | [1981/02] | French: | Collecteur solaire pour toitures inclinées | [1981/02] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 09.10.1981 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1982/11] | 19.12.1981 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1982/11] | 01.07.1982 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1982/37] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JPS5468535 [ ] (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | DE2724314 [ ] (STRAZA GEORGE THOMAS); | FR2399630 [ ] (IVORRA CLAUDE [FR]); | DE2721343 [ ] (BITTER HARALD DR ING) |