EP0022520 - Preparation of basic triaryl methane dyestuffs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/03] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hermann, Karl Heinz, Dr. Theodor-Storm-Strasse 4 D-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE | [1981/03] | Application number, filing date | 80103763.1 | 02.07.1980 | [1981/03] | Priority number, date | DE19792928404 | 13.07.1979 Original published format: DE 2928404 | [1981/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0022520 | Date: | 21.01.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0022520 | Date: | 22.09.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.1980 | Classification | IPC: | C09B11/18 | [1982/38] | CPC: |
C09B11/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1981/03] | C09B11/12 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1981/03] | Title | German: | Herstellung basischer Triarylmethanfarbstoffe | [1981/03] | English: | Preparation of basic triaryl methane dyestuffs | [1981/03] | French: | Préparation de colorants triarylméthaniques basiques | [1981/03] | Examination procedure | 02.07.1980 | Examination requested [1981/03] | 22.04.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: {0}) | 29.05.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.08.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.03.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.06.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE231992 [ ]; | DE219417 [ ]; | DE2152703 [ ] (BASF AG); | DE2739953 [ ] (BASF AG); | EP0012283 [ ] (BAYER AG [DE]) |