EP0025094 - Injection mixing head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.05.1981 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/11] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ersfeld, Heinrich Biesenbach 11 D-5090 Leverkusen 31 / DE | [1981/11] | Application number, filing date | 80103841.5 | 07.07.1980 | [1981/11] | Priority number, date | DE19792928915 | 18.07.1979 Original published format: DE 2928915 | [1981/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0025094 | Date: | 18.03.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.1981 | Classification | IPC: | B01F15/04, // B29D27/02 | [1981/11] | CPC: |
B29B7/7663 (EP);
B29B7/7471 (EP);
B29B7/7694 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1981/11] | Title | German: | Injektionsmischkopf | [1981/11] | English: | Injection mixing head | [1981/11] | French: | Mélangeur d'injection | [1981/11] | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 07.07.1980 | Examination requested [1981/11] | 06.03.1981 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1981/27] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2108289 (ANKER WERK NUERNBERG GMBH) |