EP0023587 - Temperature-stabilized pyrogenic oxide mixture of silica oxide, process for its production and its use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 30.11.1985 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Degussa GmbH Weissfrauenstrasse 9 60311 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/39] | For all designated states Degussa Aktiengesellschaft Weissfrauenstrasse 9 D-60311 Frankfurt / DE | ||
Former [1981/06] | For all designated states Degussa Aktiengesellschaft Degussa AG Fachbereich Patente Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 Postfach 1345 D-6450 Hanau 1 (Stadtteil Wolfgang) / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kleinschmit, Peter, Dr. Wildaustrasse 19 D-6450 Hanau 9 / DE | 02 /
Schwarz, Rudolf, Dr. Taunusstrasse 2 D-8755 Alzenau / DE | [1981/06] | Application number, filing date | 80103876.1 | 08.07.1980 | [1981/06] | Priority number, date | DE19792931810 | 06.08.1979 Original published format: DE 2931810 | [1981/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0023587 | Date: | 11.02.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0023587 | Date: | 12.05.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/19] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0023587 | Date: | 29.01.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.1980 | Classification | IPC: | C01B33/18, C04B35/14, E04B1/74 | [1986/02] | CPC: |
C04B30/00 (EP,US);
C01B13/22 (EP,US);
C04B35/14 (EP,US);
C01P2004/03 (EP,US);
C01P2004/50 (EP,US);
C01P2004/84 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1982/19] | C01B33/18, C04B35/14, C04B43/00 | ||
Former IPC [1981/06] | C01B33/18, C04B43/00, C04B35/14, C01B13/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1981/06] | Title | German: | Temperaturstabilisiertes Siliciumdioxid-Mischoxid, das Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung und Verwendung | [1981/06] | English: | Temperature-stabilized pyrogenic oxide mixture of silica oxide, process for its production and its use | [1981/06] | French: | Oxyde mixte de dioxyde de silicium pyrogénique stable à la température, procédé pour sa production et son utilisation | [1981/06] | Examination procedure | 08.07.1980 | Examination requested [1981/06] | 20.08.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 04.11.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
11.02.1983
22.03.1983
ADMISSIBLE WACKER-CHEMIE GMBH Hans-Seidel-Platz 4 D-81737 München / DE | [1983/16] | 22.03.1983 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 13.07.1983 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 19.07.1983 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.1983 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 06.07.1984 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 16.09.1984 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 03.04.1985 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 14.06.1985 | Fee for printing new specification paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.07.1982 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | US3055831 [ ] (IRVIN BARNETT, et al); | US3486913 [ ] (ZIRNGIBL HANS, et al); | DE1542359 [ ] (OWENS ILLINOIS INC); | DE2153671 [ ] (DEGUSSA); | US3950259 [ ] (PALLO JOHN M, et al); | DE2702896 [ ] (CABOT CORP); | DE1671186 [ ] |