EP0023597 - Process and device for separating waste from a mixture of fibres and waste [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.04.1984 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trützschler GmbH & Co. KG Duvenstrasse 82-92 41199 Mönchengladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/06] | For all designated states Trützschler GmbH & Co. KG Duvenstrasse 82-92 D-41199 Mönchengladbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beneke, Wolfgang Güdderatherweg 28 D-4050 Mönchengladbach 4 / DE | 02 /
Jäger, Walter Nakatennusstrasse 85 D-4050 Mönchengladbach 1 / DE | [1981/06] | Application number, filing date | 80103915.7 | 09.07.1980 | [1981/06] | Priority number, date | DE19792931699 | 04.08.1979 Original published format: DE 2931699 | [1981/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0023597 | Date: | 11.02.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.1980 | Classification | IPC: | D01G15/80 | [1981/06] | CPC: |
D01G15/805 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, FR, GB, IT, LI [1981/06] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Abscheiden von Abfall aus einem Faser-Abfall-Gemisch | [1981/06] | English: | Process and device for separating waste from a mixture of fibres and waste | [1981/06] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la séparation de déchets d'un mélange fibres-déchets | [1981/06] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 26.02.1981 | Examination requested [1981/18] | 14.01.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1984/26] | 10.01.1984 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1984/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.08.1983 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR438159 [ ] (AUGUSTE ROUGE [FR]); | FR635567 [ ]; | US2700190 [ ] (ROWE JR FRANK E); | GB942540 [ ] (FERDINAND REITERER, et al); | CH395812 [ ] (RIETER AG MASCHF [CH]) |