EP0043864 - Pick-up stylus with exchangeable mounting [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.1985 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.06.1985 [1985/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DUAL GEBRÜDER STEIDINGER Leopoldstrasse 1 D-7742 St. Georgen / DE | [1982/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zimmermann, Heinrich Joh.Seb.Bach Strasse 14 D-7742 St. Georgen / DE | 02 /
Schamberger, Jörg Schwarzwaldstrasse 8 D-7742 St.Georgen / DE | [1982/03] | Application number, filing date | 80103998.3 | 11.07.1980 | [1982/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0043864 | Date: | 20.01.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0043864 | Date: | 06.06.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.1981 | Classification | IPC: | G11B3/42, H04R1/16 | [1982/03] | CPC: |
G11B3/42 (EP,US);
H04R1/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1982/03] | Title | German: | Tonabnehmernadel mit auswechselbarer Halterung | [1982/03] | English: | Pick-up stylus with exchangeable mounting | [1982/03] | French: | Aiguille de pick-up avec dispositif de fixation remplaçable | [1982/03] | Examination procedure | 14.09.1982 | Examination requested [1983/03] | 18.10.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 22.11.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.03.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 20.07.1982 | M02   Fee paid on   14.09.1982 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.08.1982 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   10.11.1982 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1112840 [ ] (ELECTROACUSTIC GMBH); | DE1522997 [ ] (ELECTRO VOICE); | DE2116447 [ ] (PHILIPS NV); | DE2606495 [ ]; | FR2090953 [ ] (PHILIPS NV); | FR2301891 [ ] (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | US4009885 [ ] (PRITCHARD PETER E); | FR2049418 [ ] (THOMSON CSF); | GB1285555 [ ] (PLESSEY CO LTD); | GB1152384 [ ] (ELECTRO VOICE [US]) |