EP0023040 - Apparatus for disinfecting flowable media [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.1984 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.09.1984 [1984/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hoelzle & Chelius GmbH Hugenottenallee 150 Postfach 14 02 D-63234 Neu-Isenburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/04] | For all designated states Hoelzle & Chelius GmbH Hugenottenallee 150 Postfach 14 02 D-63234 Neu-Isenburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Alvaro, Affonso, Prof. Dr. Rind'sche-Stift-Strasse 2 D-6380 Bad Homburg v. d. H. / DE | [1981/04] | Representative(s) | Linser, Heinz, et al Patentanwalt Heinz Linser Fichtestrasse 8 16548 Glienicke/Nordb. / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/04] | Linser, Heinz, et al Patentanwälte Heinz Linser Dipl. Ing. Eckhardt Eyer Postfach 10 22 10 D-63268 Dreieich / DE | Application number, filing date | 80104241.7 | 18.07.1980 | [1981/04] | Priority number, date | DE19792929813 | 23.07.1979 Original published format: DE 2929813 | [1981/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0023040 | Date: | 28.01.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0023040 | Date: | 14.09.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.1980 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/76, A61L2/20, A61L9/015 | [1981/04] | CPC: |
C02F1/76 (EP,US);
A61L2/20 (EP,US);
A61L9/015 (EP,US);
C02F1/72 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1981/04] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Entkeimung von strömungsfähigen Mitteln | [1981/04] | English: | Apparatus for disinfecting flowable media | [1981/04] | French: | Dispositif pour la désinfection de fluides | [1981/04] | Examination procedure | 06.06.1981 | Examination requested [1981/35] | 03.12.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.07.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.12.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.06.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR814972 ; | [A]US3412935 (O'KEEFFE ANDREW E); | [A]GB1233418 ; | [A]US3647523 (HORVATH ROLAND J, et al); | [X]FR2230592 (KEMA NORD AB [SE]); | [A]CA965699 (SANFAX IND LTD); | [A]FR2345393 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) |