EP0023677 - Improvements in and relating to vehicle speed control systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 06.02.1986 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AE PLC Cawston House Cawston Rugby Warwickshire CV22 7SB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/04] | For all designated states AE PLC Cawston House Cawston Rugby Warwickshire CV22 7SB / GB | ||
Former [1984/33] | For all designated states AE PLC Cawston House Cawston Rugby Warwickshire CV22 7SA / GB | ||
Former [1981/06] | For all designated states ASSOCIATED ENGINEERING LIMITED Ince House 60 Kenilworth Road Leamington Spa WarwickshireCV32 6JZ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Noddings, John The Bungalow Oxford Road Ryton-on-Dunsmore Coventry West Midlands / GB | 02 /
Borton, Roland Kenneth 68 Chaucer Road Rugby Warwickshire / GB | [1981/06] | Representative(s) | Foster, David Martyn, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP 120 Bridge Road Chertsey Surrey KT16 8LA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/06] | Foster, David Martyn, et al MATHISEN MACARA & CO. The Coach House 6-8 Swakeleys Road Ickenham Uxbridge UB10 8BZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 80104368.8 | 24.07.1980 | [1981/06] | Priority number, date | GB19790027128 | 03.08.1979 Original published format: GB 7927128 | [1981/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0023677 | Date: | 11.02.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0023677 | Date: | 04.04.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.1980 | Classification | IPC: | B60K31/00, G05D13/62 | [1981/06] | CPC: |
B60K31/045 (EP,US);
B60W2552/15 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, LU, NL, SE [1981/06] | Title | German: | Fahrzeuggeschwindigkeitsregelsysteme | [1981/06] | English: | Improvements in and relating to vehicle speed control systems | [1981/06] | French: | Systèmes de régulation de la vitesse d'un véhicule | [1981/06] | Examination procedure | 07.07.1981 | Examination requested [1981/38] | 29.04.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 15.11.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.09.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
11.04.1984
11.12.1984
ADMISSIBLE VDO Adolf Schindling AG Gräfstrasse 103 D-60487 Frankfurt / DE Opponent's representative Klein, Thomas Kruppstrasse 105 60388 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 02
14.12.1984
04.02.1985
ADMISSIBLE Daimler-Benz Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 600202 D-70302 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/08] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.04.1984
11.12.1984
ADMISSIBLE VDO Adolf Schindling AG Gräfstrasse 103 D-60487 Frankfurt / DE Opponent's representative Klein, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Sodener Strasse 9 D-65824 Schwalbach/Ts. / DE | ||
02
14.12.1984
04.02.1985
ADMISSIBLE Daimler-Benz Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 600202 D-70302 Stuttgart / DE | |||
Former [1985/03] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.04.1984
11.12.1984
ADMISSIBLE VDO Adolf Schindling AG Gräfstrasse 103 D-60487 Frankfurt / DE Opponent's representative Klein, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Sodener Strasse 9 D-65824 Schwalbach/Ts. / DE | 11.02.1985 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.06.1985 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 21.10.1985 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 31.10.1985 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1986/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.07.1984 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | US3952829 [ ] (GRAY LARRY O); | US4072206 [ ] (LARSON GERALD L, et al); | FR2361716 [ ] (ASS ENG LTD [GB]); | US4140202 [ ] (NODDINGS JOHN, et al); | WO7901151 [ ] (ASS ENG LTD [GB], et al) |