EP0024702 - Disazo compounds, process for their preparation and their use as dyestuffs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/07] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [1981/10] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Postfach 80 03 20 D-65926 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kühne, Rudolf, Dr. Oestricher Weg 27 D-6000 Frankfurt am Main 71 / DE | 02 /
Hamal, Heinrich Am Kalkofen 39 D-6237 Liederbach / DE | [1981/10] | Application number, filing date | 80104999.0 | 22.08.1980 | [1981/10] | Priority number, date | DE19792935638 | 04.09.1979 Original published format: DE 2935638 | [1981/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0024702 | Date: | 11.03.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0024702 | Date: | 18.03.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0024702 | Date: | 16.02.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C09B35/22, D06P1/18, C08K5/23, D21H1/46 | [1981/10] | CPC: |
C09B35/22 (EP,US);
Y10S534/01 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1981/10] | Title | German: | Disazoverbindungen, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung als Farbmittel | [1981/10] | English: | Disazo compounds, process for their preparation and their use as dyestuffs | [1981/10] | French: | Composés disazoiques, procédé pour leur préparation et leur utilisation comme colorants | [1981/10] | Examination procedure | 10.09.1981 | Examination requested [1981/46] | 10.05.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.07.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.11.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [D]DE2658396 (HOECHST AG) |