EP0025904 - Application of ambient temperature cured polymers or prepolymers to a cured elastomer and cured elastomeric articles obtained [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 16.01.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE FIRESTONE TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY 1200 Firestone Parkway Akron, Ohio 44317 / US | [1981/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hausch, Walter R. 327 Caladonia Avenue Akron Ohio 44313 / US | [1981/13] | Representative(s) | Kraus, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/31] | Kraus, Walter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 D-80539 München / DE | ||
Former [1981/13] | Krause, Dieter Tillmannsweg 4 D-14109 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 80105198.8 | 01.09.1980 | [1981/13] | Priority number, date | US19800164127 | 30.06.1980 Original published format: US 164127 | US19790073760 | 10.09.1979 Original published format: US 73760 | [1981/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0025904 | Date: | 01.04.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0025904 | Date: | 09.12.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.1981 | Classification | IPC: | B29H17/36, B60C21/00, B29H7/14, B29H7/22 | [1981/13] | CPC: |
B29C66/47 (EP,US);
B29C65/4895 (EP,US);
B29C66/73751 (EP,US);
B29C66/73755 (EP,US);
B29C73/02 (EP,US);
B29C73/163 (EP,US);
B29D30/54 (EP,US);
B29C66/026 (EP,US);
B29C66/532 (EP,US);
B29C66/71 (EP,US);
B29D2030/544 (EP,US);
B29D2030/728 (EP,US);
B29K2021/00 (EP,US);
B29L2023/005 (EP,US);
B29L2030/00 (EP,US);
B29L2031/7092 (EP,US);
Y10S152/12 (EP,US);
Y10T152/10495 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1386 (EP,US);
Y10T428/20 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31504 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31511 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31569 (EP,US);
Y10T428/3158 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31583 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31587 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31826 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2021/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1981/13] | Title | German: | Aufbringen von bei Umwelttemperatur vulkanisierbaren Polymeren oder Prepolymeren auf ein vulkanisiertes Elastomer und erhaltene vulkanisierte elastomere Produkte | [1981/13] | English: | Application of ambient temperature cured polymers or prepolymers to a cured elastomer and cured elastomeric articles obtained | [1981/13] | French: | Procédé d'application de polymères ou prépolymères vulcanisables à température ambiante sur un élastomère vulcanisé et produits élastomères vulcanisés obtenus | [1981/13] | Examination procedure | 13.04.1982 | Examination requested [1982/26] | 21.07.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.01.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.02.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 10.02.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1991/10] | 10.11.1990 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1991/10] | Appeal following examination | 16.12.1986 | Appeal received No. T0093/87 | 23.02.1987 | Statement of grounds filed | 15.11.1990 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 15.11.1990 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.11.1990 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Request for further processing for: | 07.03.1986 | Request for further processing filed | 07.03.1986 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB979106 [ ] (BRITISH BELTING & ASBESTOS LTD); | US3190338 [ ] (WOLFE MERRITT W); | DE1228525 [ ] (LEMFOERDER KUNSTSTOFF G M B H); | US3779794 [ ] (DE SANTIS G); | FR2183938 [ ] (UNIMATION INC [US]); | FR2236894 [ ] (DU PONT [US]); | US3891606 [ ] (KOGON IRVING CHARLES); | US3985688 [ ] (SPEECH STEVEN R); | FR2317110 [ ] (DU PONT [US]); | US4143454 [ ] (UTSUNOMIYA TADASHI, et al) |