EP0025913 - Safety circuit for the surveillance of magnetic valves in vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.08.1987 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE AG Postfach 40 10 60 80710 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/23] | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE AG Postfach 40 10 60 D-80710 München / DE | ||
Former [1981/13] | For all designated states Knorr-Bremse GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 D-8000 München 40 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schirmer, Klaus Mitterweg 14 D-8031 Olching / DE | 02 /
Forster, Klaus Schäftlarnstrasse 74 D-8000 München 70 / DE | [1981/13] | Application number, filing date | 80105260.6 | 04.09.1980 | [1981/13] | Priority number, date | DE19792938344 | 21.09.1979 Original published format: DE 2938344 | [1981/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0025913 | Date: | 01.04.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0025913 | Date: | 09.02.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B60T17/22 | [1981/13] | CPC: |
B60T8/885 (EP);
B60T2270/416 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1981/13] | Title | German: | Sicherheitsschaltung zur Überwachung von Magnetventilen von Fahrzeugen | [1981/13] | English: | Safety circuit for the surveillance of magnetic valves in vehicles | [1981/13] | French: | Circuit de sécurité pour la surveillance de soupapes magnétiques de véhicules | [1981/13] | File destroyed: | 14.04.1993 | Examination procedure | 30.10.1981 | Examination requested [1982/02] | 15.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.04.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.04.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/39] | 29.04.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1987/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1986 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2728666 ; | [Y]US3997889 |