EP0026444 - Device for correctly positioning yarns prior to knitting in a circular knitting machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.1985 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.04.1985 [1985/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LONATI S.p.A. Via S. Polo, 11 25123 Brescia / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1984/29] | For all designated states LONATI S.p.A. Via S. Polo, 11 I-25123 Brescia / IT | ||
Former [1981/14] | For all designated states COSTRUZIONI MECCANICHE LONATI S.p.A. Via S. Polo, 11 I-25100 Brescia / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lonati, Francesco Via Valsorda, 28 I-25100 Brescia / IT | [1981/14] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al c/o Internazionale Brevetti Ingg. Zini, Maranesi & C. Piazza Castello 1 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1981/14] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 80105734.0 | 24.09.1980 | [1981/14] | Priority number, date | IT19790026156 | 01.10.1979 Original published format: IT 2615679 | [1981/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0026444 | Date: | 08.04.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0026444 | Date: | 06.05.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0026444 | Date: | 18.04.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.1981 | Classification | IPC: | D04B15/38 | [1981/14] | CPC: |
D04B15/38 (EP,US);
D04B15/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1981/14] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung für das richtige Vorlegen von Fäden vor dem Stricken auf einer Rundstrickmaschine | [1981/14] | English: | Device for correctly positioning yarns prior to knitting in a circular knitting machine | [1981/14] | French: | Dispositif pour positionner correctement des fils avant le tricotage sur un métier à tricoter circulaire | [1981/14] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 16.10.1981 | Examination requested [1982/01] | 03.12.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 04.10.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 28.12.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.01.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US2959949 [ ] (CRAWFORD HERMAN E); | [A]DE1911848 (SANTONI & C SPA); | [A]FR2174600 (MECMOR SPA [IT]); | [D]FR2406686 (LONATI COST MECC [IT]) |