EP0026446 - Strain/deflection sensitive variable reluctance transducer assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.07.1985 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.10.1985 [1985/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WEICO CORPORATION 7008 - 220th S.W. Lynnwood Washington 98036 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/14] | For all designated states WEICO CORPORATION 7008 - 220th S.W. Lynnwood Washington 98036 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nelson, Harold K. 17029 13th Ave. N.W. Seattle, WA 98177 / US | 02 /
Kleingartner, Charles A. 8628 N.E. 142nd St. Bothell, WA 98011 / US | 03 /
Vetsch, Leroy E. 1730 Seattle Hill Rd. Bothell, Wa 98011 / US | [1981/14] | Representative(s) | Abitz, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 D-81628 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/14] | Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 D-81628 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 80105737.3 | 24.09.1980 | [1981/14] | Priority number, date | US19790080048 | 28.09.1979 Original published format: US 80048 | [1981/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0026446 | Date: | 08.04.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0026446 | Date: | 06.05.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0026446 | Date: | 19.09.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.1981 | Classification | IPC: | G01G19/07, G01G19/12, G01L1/14, G01B7/24 | [1981/14] | CPC: |
G01B7/24 (EP,US);
G01G19/07 (EP,US);
G01G19/12 (EP,US);
G01L1/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1981/14] | Title | German: | Auf Spannung/Durchbiegung ansprechender variabler Reluktanzwandler | [1981/14] | English: | Strain/deflection sensitive variable reluctance transducer assembly | [1981/14] | French: | Transducteur à reluctance variable sensible aux contraintes/déflections | [1981/14] | Examination procedure | 31.08.1981 | Examination requested [1981/45] | 26.07.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.02.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.06.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2615330 (BLACKMON TRUETT M, et al); | [X]US3033032 (GLERUM IRVIN L) |