EP0030256 - Buried servo track data recording systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.12.1984 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.02.1985 [1985/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/24] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Keidl, Steven Dennis 6422 16th Avenue N.W., Rochester, Minnesota 55901 / US | [1981/24] | Representative(s) | Grant, Iain Murray IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/24] | Grant, Iain Murray IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 80105783.7 | 25.09.1980 | [1981/24] | Priority number, date | US19790101379 | 07.12.1979 Original published format: US 101379 | [1981/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0030256 | Date: | 17.06.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0030256 | Date: | 15.02.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.1981 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/58, G11B5/02 | [1981/24] | CPC: |
G11B5/58 (EP,US);
G11B5/02 (EP,US);
G11B5/5965 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1981/24] | Title | German: | Aufzeichnungssysteme mit Servosignalen auf einer unterliegenden Spur | [1984/07] | English: | Buried servo track data recording systems | [1981/24] | French: | Système d'enregistrement avec signaux servo sur une piste inférieure | [1984/07] |
Former [1981/24] | Aufzeichnungssysteme für Servosignale auf einer unterliegenden Spur | ||
Former [1981/24] | Système d'enregistrement de signaux servo sur une piste inférieure | Examination procedure | 06.07.1981 | Examination requested [1981/38] | 22.04.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 01.08.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.11.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3614756 [ ] (MCINTOSH ROBERT P, et al) | [ ] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, Vol. 21, No. 4, September 1978, pages 1359-1360 New York, U.S.A. G.W. BROCK et al.: "Buried servo data recording apparatus". | [ ] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, Vol. 11, No. 10, March 1969, pages 1303-1304 New York, U.S.A. M. PADALINO et al.: "Trackfollowing servosystem". | [ ] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, Vol.16, No. 6, November 1973, pages 1821-1823 New York, U.S.A. R.L. COMSTOCK et al.: "Triplelayer magnetic recording track following servo concept with alternating single-frequency servo tracks". | Examination | US3404392 | US3864741 | US3864740 | US3956769 | - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 16, no. 6, November 1973, pages 1821-1823, New York, U.S.A., R.L. COMSTOCK et al.: "Triple-layer magnetic recording track following servo concept with alternating single-frequency servo tracks" |