EP0029125 - Process for the reorientation of diffusion membranes, the membranes so reoriented, and their use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.10.1981 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 253 64271 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/21] | For all designated states MERCK PATENT GmbH Postfach, Frankfurter Strasse 250 D-64271 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Strathmann, Heiner, Dr., Dipl.-Chem. Milanweg 15 D-7400 Tübingen / DE | 02 /
Zschocke, Peter, Dr., Dipl.-Chem. Albert-Schweitzer-Strasse 6 D-7406 Mössingen / DE | 03 /
Schmidt, Hans-Jürgen Sterngasse 10 D-6103 Griesheim / DE | 04 /
Wolfgang, Klaus Oberstrasse 51 D-6081 Stockstadt / DE | [1981/21] | Application number, filing date | 80106355.3 | 18.10.1980 | [1981/21] | Priority number, date | DE19792946067 | 15.11.1979 Original published format: DE 2946067 | [1981/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0029125 | Date: | 27.05.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.1981 | Classification | IPC: | B01D13/04 | [1981/21] | CPC: |
B01D65/00 (EP);
B01D67/0088 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1981/21] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Umstimmung von Diffusionsmembranen, die so umgestimmten Membranen und ihre Verwendung | [1981/21] | English: | Process for the reorientation of diffusion membranes, the membranes so reoriented, and their use | [1981/21] | French: | Procédé pour la réorientation de membranes de diffusion, ces membranes ainsi réorientées et leur utilisation | [1981/21] | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 21.10.1981 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1981/52] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4120098 [ ] (MANOS PHILIP); | US4080743 [ ] (MANOS PHILIP); | US4080744 [ ] (MANOS PHILIP); | DE2621519 [ ] (SARTORIUS MEMBRANFILTER GMBH) |