EP0031007 - Positively ignited internal-combustion engine with a main combustion chamber each per cylinder and an ignition chamber [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.1984 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.07.1984 [1984/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/26] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Latsch, Reinhard, Dr., Dipl.-Ing. Alter Postweg 19 D-7143 Vaihingen / DE | [1981/26] | Application number, filing date | 80106393.4 | 21.10.1980 | [1981/26] | Priority number, date | DE19792951029 | 19.12.1979 Original published format: DE 2951029 | [1981/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0031007 | Date: | 01.07.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0031007 | Date: | 22.06.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.1981 | Classification | IPC: | F02P13/00, H01T13/16 | [1981/26] | CPC: |
H01T13/54 (EP,US);
F02B19/12 (EP,US);
F02F1/242 (EP,US);
H01T13/16 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1981/26] | Title | German: | Fremdgezündete Brennkraftmaschine mit je einem Hauptbrennraum pro Zylinder und einer Zündkammer | [1981/26] | English: | Positively ignited internal-combustion engine with a main combustion chamber each per cylinder and an ignition chamber | [1981/26] | French: | Moteur à allumage commandé pourvu d'une chambre de combustion principale par cylindre et d'une chambre d'allumage | [1981/26] | Examination procedure | 21.10.1980 | Examination requested [1981/26] | 28.06.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 10.08.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.11.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.03.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US1342205 [ ] (DOCHTERMANN GEORGE T); | [D]DE2503811 (GEN MOTORS CORP) | [ ] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 2, Nr. 9, 23. Januar 1978 Seite 6662 M 77 * JP-A-52 122 708. |