EP0029507 - Device for putting bottles into cartons [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.1985 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Glöyer, Wolfgang Wiesenweg 51 D-2000 Oststeinbek / DE | [1981/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1981/22] | Application number, filing date | 80106448.6 | 23.10.1980 | [1981/22] | Priority number, date | DE19792943105 | 25.10.1979 Original published format: DE 2943105 | [1981/50] |
Former [1981/22] | DE19792943105 | 25.10.1979 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0029507 | Date: | 03.06.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0029507 | Date: | 11.07.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.1981 | Classification | IPC: | B65B21/02 | [1981/22] | CPC: |
B65B21/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1981/22] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Einbringen von Flaschen in Kartons | [1981/22] | English: | Device for putting bottles into cartons | [1981/22] | French: | Dispositif d'encartonnage de bouteilles | [1981/22] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 08.07.1981 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 02 | 19.09.1981 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority | 02.12.1981 | Examination requested [1982/18] | 15.09.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.12.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.03.1984 | Fee for grant paid | Opposition(s) | 12.04.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.11.1982 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.04.1983 | 31.10.1983 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   15.03.1984 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 11.07.1984 | FR | 11.07.1984 | IT | 11.07.1984 | NL | 11.07.1984 | SE | 11.07.1984 | AT | 23.10.1984 | CH | 31.10.1984 | LI | 31.10.1984 | [2002/24] |
Former [1999/42] | BE | 11.07.1984 | |
IT | 11.07.1984 | ||
NL | 11.07.1984 | ||
SE | 11.07.1984 | ||
AT | 23.10.1984 | ||
CH | 31.10.1984 | ||
LI | 31.10.1984 | ||
Former [1989/17] | BE | 11.07.1984 | |
NL | 11.07.1984 | ||
SE | 11.07.1984 | ||
AT | 23.10.1984 | ||
CH | 31.10.1984 | ||
LI | 31.10.1984 | ||
Former [1986/47] | BE | 11.07.1984 | |
NL | 11.07.1984 | ||
SE | 11.07.1984 | ||
AT | 23.10.1984 | ||
Former [1986/12] | BE | 11.07.1984 | |
NL | 11.07.1984 | ||
SE | 11.07.1984 | ||
Former [1985/23] | BE | 11.07.1984 | |
NL | 11.07.1984 | ||
Former [1985/16] | BE | 11.07.1984 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2727641 (TOMKINS WALTER M); | [A]US3479796 (BLUNT OWEN T) |