EP0029150 - Apparatus for burning coal dust [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.08.1982 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Buderus Aktiengesellschaft Sophienstrasse 32-34 Postfach 12 20 D-6330 Wetzlar / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/21] | For all designated states Buderus Aktiengesellschaft Sophienstrasse 32-34 Postfach 12 20 D-6330 Wetzlar / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Christian, Paul Akazienstrasse 5 D-7107 Bad Friedrichshall-Untergrisheim / DE | [1981/21] | Representative(s) | Benner, Alwin Buderus Aktiengesellschaft ZA-Patentabteilung Postfach 1220 D-6330 Wetzlar / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/21] | Benner, Alwin, Dipl.-Ing. Buderus Aktiengesellschaft ZA-Patentabteilung Postfach 1220 D-6330 Wetzlar / DE | Application number, filing date | 80106706.7 | 31.10.1980 | [1981/21] | Priority number, date | DE19792946255 | 16.11.1979 Original published format: DE 2946255 | [1981/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0029150 | Date: | 27.05.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0029150 | Date: | 05.08.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.1981 | Classification | IPC: | F23C6/04, F23C3/00, F23C1/00, F23J3/04, F23K3/02 | [1981/21] | CPC: |
F23J15/027 (EP);
F23C1/00 (EP);
F23C3/008 (EP);
F23C6/04 (EP);
F23K3/02 (EP);
F23M9/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1981/21] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Verbrennen von Kohlenstaub | [1981/21] | English: | Apparatus for burning coal dust | [1981/21] | French: | Dispositif pour la combustion de charbon pulvérisé | [1981/21] | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 03.05.1982 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1982/40] | 14.07.1982 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1982/40] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2700723 [ ]; | [AD]DE2729475 |