EP0028418 - Method and apparatus for sawing stones and marble [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 13.10.1986 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETABLISSEMENTS FERNAND PERRIER & CIE Société anonyme dite 6, place de l'Eglise 78640 Neauphle-le-Château / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1981/19] | For all designated states ETABLISSEMENTS FERNAND PERRIER & CIE Société anonyme dite 6, place de l'Eglise F-78640 Neauphle-le-Château / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Perrier, Jean 1, rue Arago Saint-Germain-de-la-Grange F-78640 Neauphle-le-Château / FR | 02 /
Perrier, Jacques 15, rue de la Treille Villiers-Saint-Frédéric F-78640 Neauphle-le-Château / FR | 03 /
Theveniault, Michel 3, résidence de la Motte F-78760 Jouars-Pontchartrain / FR | 04 /
Kurzawski, Edouard 50, route de Grosrouvre F-78940 La Queue Lez Yvelines / FR | [1981/19] | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel, et al Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/21] | Casalonga, Axel, et al BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Morassistrasse 8 D-80469 München / DE | ||
Former [1981/25] | Casalonga, Axel BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA OFFICE JOSSE & PETIT Baaderstrasse 12-14 D-8000 München 5 / DE | ||
Former [1981/19] | BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA Baaderstrasse 12-14 D-8000 München 5 / DE | Application number, filing date | 80106772.9 | 04.11.1980 | [1981/19] | Priority number, date | FR19790027255 | 05.11.1979 Original published format: FR 7927255 | [1981/19] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0028418 | Date: | 13.05.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0028418 | Date: | 07.03.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.1981 | Classification | IPC: | B28D1/12 | [1981/19] | CPC: |
B28D1/125 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1981/19] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Sägen von Steinen und Marmor | [1981/19] | English: | Method and apparatus for sawing stones and marble | [1981/19] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour le sciage de pierres et marbres | [1981/19] | Examination procedure | 28.10.1981 | Examination requested [1982/01] | 10.08.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.07.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
30.11.1984
10.01.1985
ADMISSIBLE Maschinenfabrik Korfmann GmbH Dortmunder Strasse 36 D-5810 Witten / DE Opponent's representative Wenzel & Kalkoff Patentanwälte Martin-Schmeisser-Weg 3a-3b 44227 Dortmund / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.11.1984
10.01.1985
ADMISSIBLE Maschinenfabrik Korfmann GmbH Dortmunder Strasse 36 D-5810 Witten / DE Opponent's representative Wenzel & Kalkoff Patentanwälte Martin-Schmeisser-Weg 3a-3b 44227 Dortmund / DE | ||
Former [1985/06] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.11.1984
10.01.1985
ADMISSIBLE Maschinenfabrik Korfmann GmbH Dortmunder Strasse 36 D-5810 Witten / DE Opponent's representative Patentanwälte Wenzel & Kalkoff Ruhrstrasse 26 Postfach 2448 D-58414 Witten / DE | 24.01.1985 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 04.03.1985 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 12.03.1985 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 18.05.1985 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 18.06.1986 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 28.06.1986 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1986/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 30.11.1984 | AT | 04.11.1985 | GB | 04.11.1985 | SE | 05.11.1985 | NL | 01.06.1986 | [2015/21] |
Former [1999/52] | LU | 30.11.1984 | |
AT | 04.11.1985 | ||
GB | 04.11.1985 | ||
SE | 05.11.1985 | ||
CH | 30.11.1985 | ||
LI | 30.11.1985 | ||
NL | 01.06.1986 | ||
Former [1989/26] | AT | 04.11.1985 | |
GB | 04.11.1985 | ||
SE | 05.11.1985 | ||
CH | 30.11.1985 | ||
LI | 30.11.1985 | ||
NL | 01.06.1986 | ||
Former [1989/21] | AT | 04.11.1985 | |
SE | 05.11.1985 | ||
CH | 30.11.1985 | ||
LI | 30.11.1985 | ||
NL | 01.06.1986 | ||
Former [1989/08] | AT | 04.11.1985 | |
SE | 05.11.1985 | ||
NL | 01.06.1986 | ||
Former [1988/25] | AT | 04.11.1985 | |
NL | 01.06.1986 | ||
Former [1987/20] | AT | 04.11.1985 | Documents cited: | Search | US2368092 [ ] (ANDERSON WILLIAM T); | GB644726 [ ] (GASTON LEMOINE); | FR1016336 [ ]; | FR1019251 [ ]; | FR60383E [ ]; | FR1231267 [ ]; | US3311415 [ ] (MILLER ROBERT W); | FR2256796 [ ] (UGINE CARBONE [FR]) |