EP0051692 - Traction belt with vulcanized steel cable reinforcements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.1985 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.08.1985 [1985/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CARL SCHENCK AG 64273 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/20] | For all designated states CARL SCHENCK AG D-64273 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kneifel, Heinz Sudetenstrasse 9 D-6101 Mühltal 3 / DE | [1982/20] | Representative(s) | Dallhammer, Herbert Carl Schenck AG Patentabteilung 64273 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/20] | Dallhammer, Herbert, Dipl.-Ing. Carl Schenck AG Patentabteilung D-64273 Darmstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 80106954.3 | 11.11.1980 | [1982/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0051692 | Date: | 19.05.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0051692 | Date: | 22.08.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.1981 | Classification | IPC: | B65G17/42, F16G1/00 | [1982/20] | CPC: |
B65G17/38 (EP);
B65G17/42 (EP);
F16G1/12 (EP);
F16G1/22 (EP);
B65G2201/04 (EP);
B65G2201/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1982/28] |
Former [1982/20] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Zuggurt mit einvulkanisierten Stahlseilarmierungen | [1982/20] | English: | Traction belt with vulcanized steel cable reinforcements | [1982/20] | French: | Courroie de traction avec renforcement par câbles d'acier vulcanisés | [1982/20] | Examination procedure | 12.08.1981 | Examination requested [1982/20] | 05.02.1982 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, GB, LU, NL, SE | 16.04.1982 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 06.07.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.09.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.02.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.05.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.11.1981 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 11.11.1981 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 11.11.1981 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 11.11.1981 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 11.11.1981 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 11.11.1981 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 11.11.1981 | SE   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2128932 [ ] | Examination | DE1756775 | DE350201 | DE1781096 | DE1985975U |