|
15.04.1992 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.11.1987 |
Refund of fees |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.11.1987 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.1987 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.10.1987 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.10.1987 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
7 |
|
16.06.1987 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.06.1987 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.1987 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.1987 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.05.1987 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.1987 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.05.1987 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.1987 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.1987 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.1987 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
30.10.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.10.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.10.1986 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.09.1986 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.07.1986 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
11.07.1986 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
11.07.1986 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
11.07.1986 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.1986 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.05.1986 |
Decision refusing a request for correction of errors |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.1986 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.1986 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
9 |
|
05.11.1985 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.10.1985 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.07.1985 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.07.1985 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.07.1985 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.05.1985 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.05.1985 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.1985 |
Processing of an appeal |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.04.1985 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.01.1985 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.01.1985 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.1984 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
19.12.1984 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
19.12.1984 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
19.12.1984 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.12.1984 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.11.1984 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.08.1984 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.1984 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.08.1984 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.06.1984 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.04.1984 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.04.1984 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
44 |
|
20.12.1983 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.11.1983 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.11.1983 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.1983 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.04.1983 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.1982 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.1982 |
Information concerning the posting of documents in due time |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.11.1982 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.1982 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.10.1982 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.1982 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.1982 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.1982 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.1981 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.1981 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.1981 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.1981 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
14.10.1981 |
Written request for examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.1981 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.1981 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.1981 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.1981 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.1981 |
Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of designation fee) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.1981 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.1981 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.1981 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.1981 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.1981 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.01.1981 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
48 |
|
08.01.1981 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.1981 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
50 |
|
08.01.1981 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
08.01.1981 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
19.11.1980 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.1980 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.1980 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.11.1980 |
Description |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
19.11.1980 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.1980 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.11.1980 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.1980 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
42 |
|
19.11.1980 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |